EP3179395 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR EXECUTING PROTECTED IOS SOFTWARE MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONSIFROT, Antoine Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs ZAC des Champs Blancs CS 176 16 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 02 /
SALMON-LEGAGNEUR, Charles Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs ZAC des Champs Blancs CS 176 16 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 03 /
DURAND, Alain Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs ZAC des Champs Blancs CS 176 16 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | Browaeys, Jean-Philippe TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2017/24] | Application number, filing date | 15306971.1 | 10.12.2015 | [2017/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3179395 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/14 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
G06F21/14 (EP,US);
G06F8/71 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG VON GESCHÜTZTEN IOS-SOFTWAREMODULEN | [2017/24] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR EXECUTING PROTECTED IOS SOFTWARE MODULES | [2017/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'EXÉCUTER DES MODULES DE LOGICIEL IOS PROTÉGÉ | [2017/24] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 24.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2014191968 (AUDITMARK S A [PT]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] *; | [A] - CHENXI WANG ET AL, "Protection of software-based survivability mechanisms", FOUNDATIONS OF INTRUSION TOLERANT SYSTEMS, 2003 [ORGANICALLY ASSURED A ND SURVIVABLE INFORMATION SYSTEMS] 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030101), doi:10.1109/FITS.2003.1264939, ISBN 978-0-7695-2057-5, pages 273 - 282, XP010681827 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FITS.2003.1264939 | [A] - COLLBERG C ET AL, "A Taxonomy of Obfuscating Transformations", TECHNICAL REPORT DEPARTMENT OF COMPUTER SCIENCE UNIVERSITY OFAUCKLAND, XX, XX, (19970701), no. 148, pages 1 - 36, XP002140038 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2674892 |