Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
03.02.2018 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.01.2018 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
12.05.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] |
16.12.2015 | Change - representative |