EP3185560 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ENCODING AND DECODING INFORMATION REPRESENTATIVE OF A BOKEH MODEL TO BE APPLIED TO AN ALL-IN-FOCUS LIGHT-FIELD CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2017/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOPEZ, Patrick TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE 975 avenue des Champs Blancs ZAC des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 CESSON-SÉVIGNÉ / FR | 02 /
THOREAU, Dominique TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE 975 avenue des Champs Blancs ZAC des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 CESSON-SÉVIGNÉ / FR | 03 /
BOISSON, Guillaume TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE 975 avenue des Champs Blancs ZAC des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 CESSON-SÉVIGNÉ / FR | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | Browaeys, Jean-Philippe TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2017/26] | Application number, filing date | 15307135.2 | 23.12.2015 | [2017/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3185560 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/46 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
H04N19/46 (EP);
G06T5/50 (EP);
G06T5/70 (EP);
G06T2207/10052 (EP);
H04N19/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR CODIERUNG UND DECODIERUNG VON INFORMATIONEN EINES BOKEH-MODELLS FÜR EINEN ALL-IN-FOCUS LICHTFELDINHALT | [2017/26] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ENCODING AND DECODING INFORMATION REPRESENTATIVE OF A BOKEH MODEL TO BE APPLIED TO AN ALL-IN-FOCUS LIGHT-FIELD CONTENT | [2017/26] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE ET DE DÉCODAGE D'INFORMATIONS REPRÉSENTATIVES D'UN MODÈLE BOKEH DEVANT ÊTRE APPLIQUÉES À UN CONTENU DE CHAMP LUMINEUX TOTALEMENT MISE AU POINT | [2017/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/25] | 05.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2687890 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,4 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0048] *; | [X]WO2015115946 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-15 * page 1 - page 33 *; | [A] - HEUNG-YEUNG SHUM ET AL, "Review of image-based rendering techniques", OPTOMECHATRONIC MICRO/NANO DEVICES AND COMPONENTS III : 8 - 10 OCTOBER 2007, LAUSANNE, SWITZERLAND; [PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE , ISSN 0277-786X], SPIE, BELLINGHAM, WASH, (20000101), vol. 4067, ISBN 978-1-62841-730-2, pages 2 - 13, XP002401068 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0002] * | by applicant | US8514491 | US2013222633 | - WILBURN ET AL., "High performance imaging using large camera arrays", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS (TOG, (2005), vol. 24, no. 3, pages 765 - 776 | - M.W TAO ET AL., DEPTH FROM COMBINING DEFOCUS AND CORRESPONDENCE USING LIGHT-FIELD CAMERAS | - M.W.TAO ET AL., DEPTH FROM COMBINING DEFOCUS AND CORRESPONDENCE USING LIGHT-FIELD CAMERAS |