02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
05.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
12.01.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] |
09.01.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.01.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.01.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
03.01.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.10.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.10.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
13.10.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
03.01.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.08.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.05.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.01.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.06.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.02.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.02.2021 |
First examination report |
|
12.01.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.01.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.01.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
19.01.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
19.01.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
12.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.01.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.06.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] |
12.01.2016 |
Change - representative |
|