Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9978177 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2018 | B2 | US2017193699 | 06.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15307199 | 31.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6878011B | Global Dossier | 26.05.2021 | B2 | JP2017120648 | 06.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15307199 | 31.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107067473B | Global Dossier | 01.07.2022 | B | CN107067473 | 18.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15307199 | 31.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3188033 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2024 | C0 | EP3188033 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2024 | B1 | EP3188033 | 05.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15307199 | 31.12.2015 |