EP3065369 - Method and system for automatically authorizing communications based on location [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonica Digital España, S.L.U. Gran Via 28 28013 Madrid / ES | [2016/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neystadt, John (Eugene) C/ Gran Vía, 28 28013 Madrid / ES | 02 /
Small, Ian C/ Gran Vía, 28 28013 Madrid / ES | 03 /
Cardineau, Fabien C/ Gran Vía, 28 28013 Madrid / ES | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 15382095.6 | 04.03.2015 | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3065369 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
H04L63/107 (EP,US);
H04W12/08 (EP);
H04W12/63 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur automatischen Autorisierung von Kommunikation basierend auf dem Standort | [2016/36] | English: | Method and system for automatically authorizing communications based on location | [2016/36] | French: | Procédé et système pour autoriser automatiquement des communications basées sur un emplacement | [2016/36] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/38] | 24.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1686503 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-15* paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0061]; figure 4 *; | [X]US2014280983 (PALUCH BRYAN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0054]; figure 3 * |