Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
09.05.2017 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.04.2017 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.08.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
06.03.2015 | Change - representative |