17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
05.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
03.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
15.06.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
01.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
25.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
19.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
12.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
07.07.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
06.07.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
30.06.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
30.06.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.04.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.04.2017 |
Change - inventor |
|
10.03.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
18.11.2016 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
18.11.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
18.11.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
10.05.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] |
23.10.2015 |
Change - representative |
|