EP2937508 - PING-PONG MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stöckli, Walter Alpsteinstrasse 33 9100 Herisau / CH | For all designated states Stöckli, Alfred Alpsteinstrasse 33 9100 Herisau / CH | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/44] | Application number, filing date | 15405022.3 | 20.03.2015 | [2015/44] | Priority number, date | CH20140000620 | 23.04.2014 Original published format: CH 6202014 | [2015/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2937508 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01B7/16, F01L1/06, F01B9/04, F02B75/28, F02B75/00 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
F01B7/16 (EP);
F01B9/047 (EP);
F02B75/002 (EP);
F02B75/282 (EP);
F01L1/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PING-PONG MOTOR | [2015/44] | English: | PING-PONG MOTOR | [2015/44] | French: | MOTEUR DE DISPOSITIF DE PING-PONG | [2015/44] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/51] | 23.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000356137 (SAKODA SHUICHI) [Y] 1 * abstract * * figure - *; | [Y]WO2005111374 (BOUGUEROUA BADI [DZ]) [Y] 1 * abstract * * figure - *; | [Y]WO2013149315 (ROBAR SHELDON [CA]) [Y] 1 * abstract * * figure - *; | [Y]DE202013006601U (BLATT HANS PETER [DE], et al) [Y] 1 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]EP2447499 (NAMIKOSHI HIROMICHI [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure - * |