EP3150112 - AN IMPEDANCE MEASUREMENT FOOTWEAR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akern S.r.L. Via Lisbona n. 32-34 50065 Pontassieve (FI) / IT | [2017/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Talluri, Antonio Via Montepilli, 8 50012 Bagno a Ripoli (FI) / IT | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Emmi, Mario Studio Brevetti Turini Srl Viale Matteotti, 25 50121 Firenze (FI) / IT | [2017/14] | Application number, filing date | 15425076.5 | 30.09.2015 | [2017/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3150112 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/053, A41B11/00, A43B3/00 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
A61B5/6807 (EP);
A43B17/00 (EP);
A43B3/34 (EP);
A61B5/0537 (EP);
A61B5/6812 (EP);
A61B5/6829 (EP);
A61B5/4875 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Extension states | BA | 06.10.2015 | ME | 06.10.2015 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUHWERKSYSTEM MIT IMPEDANZMESSUNG | [2017/14] | English: | AN IMPEDANCE MEASUREMENT FOOTWEAR SYSTEM | [2017/14] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CHAUSSURE DE MESURE D'IMPÉDANCE | [2017/14] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/14] | 13.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002169387 (MARMAROPOULOS GEORGE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,10,13,14 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 3,7,9,11,12; | [XI]WO2014201522 (TI2 PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0056] * * figure 1 * [I] 3-15; | [XI]US2008001735 (TRAN BAO [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0199] * * paragraph [0201] * * paragraph [0202] - paragraph [0203] * * paragraph [0212] * [I] 3-15 |