EP2944618 - METHOD OF GLASS BATCH THICKENING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techglass Sp. z o.o. ul. Zygmunta Starego 124 30-198 Krakow / PL | [2015/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klisch, Marian ul. Kardynata Stefana Wyszynskiego 57D 38-400 Krosno / PL | 02 /
Kadow, Grazyna ul. Walecka 13C 64-920 Pila / PL | 03 /
Lenartowicz, Jacek ul. Nad Rzeka19 64-917 Skórka / PL | [2015/47] | Representative(s) | Magonska, Alina AMAG Kancelaria Patentowa Alina Magonska ul. Dobrego Pasterza 108/106 PL-31-416 Krakow / PL | [2015/47] | Application number, filing date | 15460015.9 | 08.05.2015 | [2015/47] | Priority number, date | PL20140408208 | 14.05.2014 Original published format: PL 40820814 | [2015/47] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2944618 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C03C1/02 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
C03C1/026 (EP);
C04B28/006 (EP);
Y02P40/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GLASGEMENGEVERDICKUNG | [2015/47] | English: | METHOD OF GLASS BATCH THICKENING | [2015/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉPAISSISSEMENT D'UN LOT DE VERRE | [2015/47] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/51] | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH01201032 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *; | [IY]US3956446 (EIRICH PAUL, et al) [I] 1 * col. 1, l. 14-50; col. 3, l. 23-31, col. 4, l. 3-8, l. 46-53, l. 64-col. 5, l. 22, l. 58-62; col. 7, l. 47-53; col. 8, l. 41-45, l. 67-col. 9, l. 15, l. 59-67 * [Y] 2-10; | [IY]US5472917 (TALLING BOB LARS O [FI], et al) [I] 1 * col. 1, l. 62-col. 4, l. 8; example 1; claim 1 * [Y] 2-10; | [A]US5349118 (DAVIDOVITS JOSEPH [FR]) [A] 1-10 * col. 3, l. 37-col. 4, l. 14, col. 8, l. 60-col. 10, l. 15; col. 11, l. 12-col. 13, l. 52, claim 1 *; | [A]US4509985 (DAVIDOVITS JOSEPH [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * col. 3, l. 7-25 * | [Y] - WILLIAM D A RICKARD ET AL, "Thermal analysis of geopolymer pastes synthesised from five fly ashes of variable composition", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, vol. 358, no. 15, doi:10.1016/J.JNONCRYSOL.2012.05.032, ISSN 0022-3093, (20120612), pages 1830 - 1839, (20120524), XP028498091 [Y] 1-10 * p. 1830: 1. Introduction; p. 1831: 2.1 Materials, 2.2 Geopolymer Synthesis, table 1; p. 1832-1833: 3.2 Structural evolution; p. 1837-1838: 4. Discussion; 5. Conclusion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jnoncrysol.2012.05.032 | [A] - YAO JUN ZHANG ET AL, "Structure characterization of hydration products generated by alkaline activation of granulated blast furnace slag", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20081024), vol. 43, no. 22, doi:10.1007/S10853-008-3028-9, ISSN 1573-4803, pages 7141 - 7147, XP019644419 [A] 1-10 * p. 1741: Introduction; p. 1742: Materials, Preparation of geopolymer paste; Results and discussion, p. 7144-7146: Hydration mechanism-Conclusion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10853-008-3028-9 | by applicant | US3967943 | US3914364 | US4023976 | US4026691 | US4028131 | US4031175 | US4235618 | US4236929 | US4252754 | PL111274B | US4349366 | US6296699 | US28131 | US311175 | - CHEN NIANYI; LIU MIAOXIU; YANG JINGXIU, "Influence of Preparative History on Phisico-chemical Properties of Sodium Aluminate Solutions", CHIN.J.MAT.SCI. TECHNOL., (1992), vol. 8, pages 135 - 137 |