Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3011940T | 31.01.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP15460094 | 08.10.2015 | PL40987314 | 21.10.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9504618 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2016 | B2 | US2016106607 | 21.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | PL40987314 | 21.10.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3011940 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2017 | B1 | EP3011940 | 27.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | PL40987314 | 21.10.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3011940T | 06.11.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | PL40987314 | 21.10.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL235416B | 27.07.2020 | B1 | PL409873 | 25.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | PL40987314 | 21.10.2014 |