Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018204462 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15465540 | 18.09.2015 | WO2016EP66880 | 15.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108028019B | Global Dossier | 24.08.2021 | B | CN108028019 | 11.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15465540 | 18.09.2015 | WO2016EP66880 | 15.07.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017045802 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15465540 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3144919 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2020 | B1 | EP3144919 | 22.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15465540 | 18.09.2015 |