EP3040590 - REGULATING VENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skoda Auto a.s. Tr. Václava Klementa 869 29301 Mladá Boleslav / CZ | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sikora, Michal Kvetnická 1624 66601 Tisnov / CZ | [2016/27] | Application number, filing date | 15466021.1 | 21.12.2015 | [2016/27] | Priority number, date | CZ20140000967 | 30.12.2014 Original published format: CZ 20140967 | [2016/27] | Filing language | CS | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3040590 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/08 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
F16K31/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/08] |
Former [2016/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REGELVENTIL | [2016/27] | English: | REGULATING VENT | [2016/27] | French: | SOUPAPE DE REGULATION | [2016/27] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/08] | 10.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/32] | 27.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4491142 (SHIMIZU KUNIO [JP]) [X] 1-3* column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 31; figures 5a-6b *; | [X]FR2808576 (SIDEL SA [FR]) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 13 - page 10, line 2; figure - *; | [X]US2006102234 (MEISEL DAVID [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0040]; figures 1a-1c, 5, 20 *; | [X]US2007246672 (SABIRON GERARD [FR], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102009012822 (PRAEDEL BIRGIT [DE]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * |