EP3091923 - SYMPATHETIC NERVE ABLATION DEVICES WITH AN EXPANSION-LIMITING MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | [2016/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Jan Holdaal 49 NL-6228 GJ Maastricht / NL | 02 /
WILLARD, Martin R. 1514 Raleigh Drive Burnsville, Minnesota 55337 / US | 03 /
LINDQUIST, Jeffrey S. 9852 Troy Lane N Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311 / US | [2016/46] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/46] | Application number, filing date | 15700523.2 | 05.01.2015 | [2016/46] | WO2015US10162 | Priority number, date | US201461924123P | 06.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461924123 P | [2016/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015103541 | Date: | 09.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3091923 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, A61B18/00, A61B17/00 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0022 (US);
A61B2018/00404 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00434 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00511 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/46] | Title | German: | ABLATIONSVORRICHTUNGEN FÜR SYMPATHIKUS MIT EINEM EXPANSIONSBEGRENZENDEN ELEMENT | [2016/46] | English: | SYMPATHETIC NERVE ABLATION DEVICES WITH AN EXPANSION-LIMITING MEMBER | [2016/46] | French: | DISPOSITIFS D'ABLATION DE NERFS SYMPATHIQUES AVEC ÉLÉMENT DE LIMITATION D'EXPANSION | [2016/46] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/46] | 01.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2003060820 (MAGUIRE MARK A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,13 * paragraph [0171]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0201] * * paragraph [0206]; figures 11a-d * * paragraph [0203]; figures 8a-b * * paragraph [0204] * [Y] 11 [I] 3,9-12; | [YA]US2009069878 (WEBER JAN [NL], et al) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065]; figures 7-10 * [A] 1-10,12-15; | [XI]WO2012009486 (LOMA VISTA MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 15 * paragraph [0267] - paragraph [0271]; figure 25 * * paragraph [0198] * * paragraph [0193] - paragraph [0194]; figure 9c * * paragraph [0017]; figure 26a * [I] 1,4-8,13,14; | [A]US2013165926 (MATHUR PRABODH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0308] - paragraph [0309]; figures 1a-b ** paragraph [0171] - paragraph [0172] * | by applicant | US5238004 | US6508803 |