EP3097172 - METHOD OF TREATING TEXTILE FABRICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2016/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIRACLE, Gregory Scot 1 Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 02 /
JACKSON, Michelle Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne Tyne and Wear NE12 9TS / GB | 03 /
SOUTER, Philip Frank Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne Tyne and Wear NE12 9TS / GB | 04 /
LANT, Neil Joseph Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne Tyne and Wear NE12 9TS / GB | [2016/48] | Representative(s) | Peet, Jillian Wendy Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [2016/48] | Application number, filing date | 15700623.0 | 08.01.2015 | [2016/48] | WO2015US10608 | Priority number, date | US201461930079P | 22.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461930079 P | [2016/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015112338 | Date: | 30.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3097172 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/42, C11D11/00 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
C11D3/42 (EP,US);
C11D3/26 (US);
C11D3/28 (US);
C11D2111/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON TEXTILSTOFFEN | [2016/48] | English: | METHOD OF TREATING TEXTILE FABRICS | [2016/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACES TEXTILES | [2016/48] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/48] | 31.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 10.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]US3657231 (BOOTH GARY E); | [I]US3828060 (LYNESS W, et al); | [XI]US4294711 (HARDY FREDERICK E, et al); | [XAI]WO0250364 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [XDI]WO2007104916 (DYLON INTERNAT LTD [GB], et al); | [XI]EP2305786 (BASF SE [DE]) | by applicant | US2826551 | US2954347 | GB849433 | BE680847 | US3455839 | DE2124526 | US3933672 | US3958581 | US3962418 | US3964500 | US4075118 | US4152416 | US4197865 | US4217914 | US4265779 | US4364837 | US4381919 | US4422853 | US4430243 | US4489455 | US4489574 | US4507280 | US4529586 | EP0150872 | US4639489 | US4652392 | US4663158 | EP0256696 | EP0262897 | US4749740 | US4760025 | US4762636 | US4798679 | WO8906270 | WO9001815 | US4978471 | US4983316 | US4990280 | WO9108281 | US5104646 | US5106609 | WO9402597 | US5288431 | USRE34584E | WO9418314 | US5352604 | US5486307 | US5489392 | US5516448 | WO9623874 | WO9623873 | US5565422 | US5569645 | US5574005 | US5576282 | WO9700324 | US5595967 | US5597936 | US5674478 | US5679630 | WO9743424 | US5691297 | WO9817767 | US5750122 | US5807956 | WO9852907 | US5856164 | US5879584 | WO9923211 | US5981681 | US6020303 | US6060443 | WO0032601 | US6093562 | EP1022334 | WO0060060 | US6166117 | EP1070115 | US6207782 | US6225464 | US6291412 | US6306812 | US6312936 | US6326348 | DE10036533 | US6482969 | WO03018740 | WO03018738 | US2003087791 | US2003087790 | US6607717 | US2004048764 | US6787512 | US2005003983 | US6855680 | US2005048549 | WO2005042532 | WO2005052161 | WO2005052146 | US6939702 | US2005203213 | US2005227891 | WO2006002643 | US7041767 | WO2006053598 | US2006205631 | US7141403 | US7153818 | WO2007006357 | US2007041929 | WO2007039042 | WO2007044993 | US7208459 | US7217777 | EP1794274 | US2007173430 | US7262042 | WO2007096052 | US2007207109 | WO2007104916 | US7294611 | US2007286837 | WO2008015443 | WO2008014965 | US2008034511 | WO2008087497 | WO2008090091 | US7445644 | US2008305982 | US7465439 | WO2009021867 | WO2009043709 | US2009176684 | WO2009087033 | WO2009100102 | US2009217464 | US7585376 | US2009247449 | WO2009124908 | WO2009127587 | WO2009132870 | WO2009149144 | WO2009149145 | WO2009149130 | EP2133410 | WO2010022775 | US7686892 | WO2010034736 | WO2010056653 | WO2010056640 | WO2010084039 | DE102009001144 | WO2010115028 | WO2010130624 | WO2010142503 | WO2011011799 | WO2011020991 | US7909890 | WO2011072117 | EP2357220 | WO2011098355 | US2011237487 | WO2011140316 | WO2011163457 | WO2012000846 | WO2012004134 | US8138222 | US2012090102 | US2012129752 | WO2012095354 | US2012225803 | US8268016 | WO2012151480 | WO2012166768 | EP2540825 | EP19890307851 | EP20080101442 | EP20120001034 |