EP3099854 - ROPE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teufelberger Fiber Rope GmbH Vogelweiderstrasse 50 4600 Wels / AT | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRTH, Rudolf Am Poschenhof 45 A-4840 Vöcklabruck / AT | 02 /
RÜHRNÖSSL, Erich Winklerstrasse 8 A-4053 Haid / AT | 03 /
SCHIEMER, Susanna Breitwiesergutstrasse 8/5 A-4020 Linz / AT | 04 /
ERNST, Björn Schlagenstraße 27/3 A-4810 Gmunden / AT | [2019/32] |
Former [2016/49] | 01 /
KIRTH, Rudolf Am Poschenhof 45 A-4840 Vöcklabruck / AT | ||
02 /
RÜHRNÖSSL, Erich Winklerstrasse 8 A-4053 Haid / AT | |||
03 /
SCHIEMER, Susanna Breitwiesergutstrasse 8/5 A-4020 Linz / AT | |||
04 /
ERNST, Björn Zollamtstrasse 7/10 A-4020 Linz / AT | Representative(s) | Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte GmbH Patentanwälte Wipplingerstraße 30 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/32] | Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte OG Patentanwälte Wipplingerstraße 30 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2016/49] | Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstraße 30 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 15700988.7 | 15.01.2015 | [2016/49] | WO2015EP50652 | Priority number, date | AT20140050061 | 30.01.2014 Original published format: AT 500612014 | [2016/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015113823 | Date: | 06.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3099854 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3099854 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | D07B1/22, D07B1/18, B66B7/06 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
D07B1/162 (EP,AT,KR,US);
D07B1/025 (AT,KR);
D07B1/22 (EP,AT,KR,US);
B66B7/062 (EP,KR,US);
D07B1/18 (EP,KR,US);
D07B2201/1008 (EP,KR,US);
D07B2201/2085 (EP,KR,US);
D07B2201/2087 (EP,KR,US);
D07B2201/209 (EP,KR,US);
D07B2201/2091 (EP,KR,US);
D07B2401/2005 (EP,KR,US);
D07B2401/2015 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEILVERBUND | [2016/49] | English: | ROPE ASSEMBLY | [2016/49] | French: | ENSEMBLE CABLE | [2019/13] |
Former [2016/49] | ENSEMBLE CÂBLE | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/49] | 20.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.01.2015 | AL | 07.08.2019 | CY | 07.08.2019 | CZ | 07.08.2019 | DK | 07.08.2019 | EE | 07.08.2019 | ES | 07.08.2019 | HR | 07.08.2019 | IT | 07.08.2019 | LT | 07.08.2019 | LV | 07.08.2019 | MC | 07.08.2019 | MK | 07.08.2019 | MT | 07.08.2019 | NL | 07.08.2019 | PL | 07.08.2019 | RO | 07.08.2019 | RS | 07.08.2019 | SE | 07.08.2019 | SI | 07.08.2019 | SK | 07.08.2019 | SM | 07.08.2019 | TR | 07.08.2019 | BG | 07.11.2019 | GR | 08.11.2019 | AT | 15.01.2020 | IE | 15.01.2020 | LU | 15.01.2020 | CH | 31.01.2020 | FR | 31.01.2020 | LI | 31.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 15.01.2015 | |
AL | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
MT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 15.01.2020 | ||
LU | 15.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
FR | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 15.01.2020 | ||
LU | 15.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
FR | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IE | 15.01.2020 | ||
LU | 15.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
FR | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
LU | 15.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
FR | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
LU | 15.01.2020 | ||
FR | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
LU | 15.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 07.08.2019 | |
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | LT | 07.08.2019 | |
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | LT | 07.08.2019 | |
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 07.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE2348713 (BAUR HANS) [X] 1,5,6 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 5; figure -; claim 1 * [Y] 3,4; | [XY]GB2050998 (LINDAHL SVENSK LASTHANTERING) [X] 1,2,5,6 * page 1, line 101 - line 105 * * page 1, line 130 - page 2, line 5; figure - * [Y] 4; | [X]US4850629 (ST GERMAIN DENNIS [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6 * column 1, line 49 - line 60; figures 1,4-6 * * column 3, line 35 - line 39 *; | [XY]DE20314422U (SPANSET SECUTEX SICHERHEITSTEC [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4; | [A]US2007111588 (WEINBERGER KARL [CH]) [A] 7 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018]; figures 3,4 ** abstract *; | [X]DE102009005093 (KONE CORP [FI]) [X] 1,7 * paragraphs [0068] , [0069]; figures 2,3; claims 1,24,35 *; | [Y]DE102008026731 (UNIV CHEMNITZ TECH [DE]) [Y] 4 * figure 4; claim 1 *; | [A]DE102009006063 (UNIV CHEMNITZ TECH [DE]) [A] 4,7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] , [0023] , [0028] , [0041] , [0071] , [0098] , [0099]; figure 5 * | by applicant | DE2114278 | EP1061172 | WO2011121272 |