EP3096896 - METHOD FOR OPTIMALLY PRODUCING METAL STEEL AND IRON ALLOYS IN HOT-ROLLED AND THICK PLATE FACTORIES USING A MICROSTRUCTURE SIMULATOR, MONITOR, AND/OR MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2023 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2023 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS group GmbH Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2016/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
HASSEL, Christoph Lauenburger Allee 53 47269 Duisburg / DE | [2016/48] | Representative(s) | Klüppel, Walter Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstraße 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [2016/48] | Application number, filing date | 15701113.1 | 13.01.2015 | [2016/48] | WO2015EP50460 | Priority number, date | DE201410201086 | 22.01.2014 Original published format: DE102014201086 | DE201410224461 | 28.11.2014 Original published format: DE102014224461 | [2016/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015110310 | Date: | 30.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3096896 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3096896 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B21B37/00 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
C21D11/005 (EP,US);
B21B37/00 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B21B1/22 (US);
B21B1/463 (KR);
B21B37/74 (US);
C21D9/46 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERTEN HERSTELLUNG VON METALLISCHEN STAHL- UND EISENLEGIERUNGEN IN WARMWALZ- UND GROBBLECHWERKEN MITTELS EINES GEFÜGESIMULATORS, -MONITORS UND/ODER -MODELLS | [2016/48] | English: | METHOD FOR OPTIMALLY PRODUCING METAL STEEL AND IRON ALLOYS IN HOT-ROLLED AND THICK PLATE FACTORIES USING A MICROSTRUCTURE SIMULATOR, MONITOR, AND/OR MODEL | [2016/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION OPTIMISÉE D'ALLIAGES MÉTALLIQUES À BASE D'ACIER ET DE FER DANS DES UNITÉS DE LAMINAGE À CHAUD ET DE FABRICATION DE TÔLES FORTES AU MOYEN D'UN SIMULATEUR, MONITEUR ET/OU MODÈLE DE STRUCTURE | [2016/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/48] | 19.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE SpA Via Nazionale 41 33042 Buttrio (Udine) / IT Opponent's representative Petraz, Davide Luigi GLP S.r.l Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | 02
20.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE ArcelorMittal 24-26, Boulevard d'Avranches 1160 Luxembourg / LU Opponent's representative Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | 03
20.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2018/43] | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 02.10.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.04.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.10.2020 | 15.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.12.2021 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 18.02.2022 | Appeal received No. T0466/22 | 18.02.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 19.04.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.07.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2015 | AL | 20.12.2017 | CY | 20.12.2017 | CZ | 20.12.2017 | DK | 20.12.2017 | EE | 20.12.2017 | ES | 20.12.2017 | FI | 20.12.2017 | GR | 20.12.2017 | HR | 20.12.2017 | LT | 20.12.2017 | LV | 20.12.2017 | MC | 20.12.2017 | MK | 20.12.2017 | MT | 20.12.2017 | NL | 20.12.2017 | PL | 20.12.2017 | PT | 20.12.2017 | RO | 20.12.2017 | RS | 20.12.2017 | SE | 20.12.2017 | SI | 20.12.2017 | SK | 20.12.2017 | SM | 20.12.2017 | TR | 20.12.2017 | IE | 13.01.2018 | LU | 13.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | FR | 20.02.2018 | BG | 20.03.2018 | NO | 20.03.2018 | IS | 20.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 13.01.2015 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MK | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 20.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 13.01.2015 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 20.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 20.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 20.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 20.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 20.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 20.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 20.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO9818970 (VOEST ALPINE IND ANLAGEN [AT], et al) [YD] 1-13 * page 6 - page 7 *; | [Y]US6309482 (DORRICOTT JONATHAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 4, line 6 - line 44 * * column 11, line 31 - line 37 *; | [Y]EP2058060 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0002] * | Opposition | US8108064 | US6430461 | US2010131092 | US2007198122 | US2007088524 | US6546310 | JP2013066929 | JP2003328030 | US4775429 | US2004205951 | CN1664550 | WO9818970 | US6309482 | EP2058060 | DE19881711 | DE102007007560 | WO2005099923 | - OHIOON KWON, "A Technology for the Prediction and Control of Microstructural Changes and Mechanical Properties in Steel", ISIJ International, (19920000), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 350 - 358, XP055322272 | - MOHAMED I SHAHTOUT et al., "Thermo- mechanical modeling of thin slab direct rolling of Nb steels", Journal of Engineering Manufacture, (20120000), vol. 226, no. 8, pages 1346 - 1353, XP055520359 | - HANS-ULRICH LOFFLER, "New Analysis- and Simulation-features of the Microstructure Monitor and First Results from Plate Mills", AISTech 2011 Proceedings, (20110000), vol. II, pages 281 - 288, XP055520365 | - ANANYA MUKHOPADHYAY et al., "CQE - Controlling Mechanical Properties of Hot Rolled Coil", AISTECH - CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, Pittsburgh, PA, (20080000), vol. 2, pages 311 - 328, XP055520372 | - I. MOHANTY et al., "Online mechanical property prediction system for hot rolled IF steel", Ironmaking & Steelmaking Process, Products and Applications, (20140129), vol. 41, no. 8, pages 618 - 627, XP055520380 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1179/1743281214Y.0000000178 | - ANANYA MUKHOPADHYAY et al., "Implementation Experience of DANIELI-CQETM at Hot Strip Mill", AISTech 2010 Proceedings, (20100000), vol. II, pages 859 - 867, XP055520386 | - TAO JIA et al., "The Optimal Design for the Production of Hot Rolled Strip with ''Tight Oxide Scale'' by Using Multi-objective Optimization", ISIJ International, (20110000), vol. 51, no. 9, pages 1468 - 1473, XP055520391 | - ANANYA MUKHOADHYAY et al., "Prediction of mechanical properties of hot rolled, low-carbon steel strips using artificial neural network", Materials and Manufacturing Processes, (20050000), vol. 20, pages 793 - 812, XP055520395 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1081/AMP-200055140 | - ANANYA MUKHOPADHYAY et al., "DANIELI-CQE: System for Controlling Mechanical Properties of Hot-Rolled Coil", Materials and Manufacturing Processes, (20100000), vol. 25, pages 76 - 84, XP055520401 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10426910903153091 | - KIYOSHI NISHIOKA et al., "Progress in thermomechanical control of steel plates and their commercialization", Science and Technology of Advanced Materials, (20120403), vol. 13, XP055520407 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1468-6996113/2/023001 | - YOSHIYUKI WATANABE et al., "Integrated Model for Microstructural Evolution and Properties of Steel Plates Manufactured in Production Line", ISIJ International, (19920000), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 405 - 413, XP055520413 | - ATSUHIKO YOSHIE et al., "Modelling of Microstructural Evolution and Mechanical Properties of Steel Plates Produced by Thermo-Mechanical Control Process", ISIJ International, (19920000), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 395 - 404, XP000609404 | - TAKEHIDE SENUMA et al., "Mathematical Models for Predicting Microstructural Evolution and Mechanical Properties of Hot Strip s", ISIJ International, (19920000), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 423 - 432, XP055520429 | - I ANANYA MUKHOPADHYAY et al., "QTB Plus: Better Control for Mechanical Properties of Quenched and Tempered Bars", AISTech 2009 Proceedings, (20090000), vol. II, pages 699 - 712, XP055520432 | - ANTONIO AUGUSTO GORNI et al., "Accelerated Cooling of Steel Plates: The Time Has Come", Journal of ASTM International, (20080000), vol. 5, no. 8, pages 1 - 7, XP055520468 | - U. LOTTER et al., "Structure of the metallurgical oriented modelling system TK-StripCAM for simulation of hot strip manufacture and application in research and production practice", J. Phys., (20040000), vol. 120, pages 801 - 808, XP055521349 | - ILSE HECKELMANN, "Dynamische Fertigungssteuerung: Neue Präzision in der Stahlerzeugung", Zusammenfassung des Referats, (20081120), XP055521355 | - "Von der Prozessoptimierung zum Hochleistungsstahl", Konstruktion, (20090100), XP055521363 | - "Primus Stahl: Hart und smart", FACHPRESSEFORUM WERKSTOFFE BEi THYSSENKRUPP STEEL Blech InForm, (20080600), pages 54 - 55, XP055521371 |