EP3094665 - POLYMERS COMPRISING SULFONIC ACID GROUPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Vision Care, Inc. 7500 Centurion Parkway Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Vision Care Inc. 7500 Centurion Parkway Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHADEVAN, Shivkumar 3635 Casitas Drive Jacksonville, FL 32224 / US | 02 /
MAGGIO, Thomas L. 8915 Hampton Landing Drive E. Jacksonville, Florida 32256 / US | 03 /
HEALY, Brent Matthew 3661 Casitas Drive Jacksonville, Florida 32224 / US | 04 /
SONODA, Leilani K. 310 Pine Street Atlantic Beach, Florida 32233 / US | 05 /
TURNAGE, Michelle Carman 4343 Redwood Avenue Jacksonville, Florida 32207 / US | 06 /
VASHI, Hemantkumar 11983 Marldon Lane Jacksonville, Florida 32258 / US | [2016/47] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/47] | Application number, filing date | 15701859.9 | 06.01.2015 | [2016/47] | WO2015US10283 | Priority number, date | US201414155678 | 15.01.2014 Original published format: US201414155678 | [2016/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015108722 | Date: | 23.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3094665 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/28, C08G77/442 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
G02B1/043 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C08F283/122 (RU);
C08G77/28 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C08F230/08 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C08G77/392 (RU);
C08G77/442 (EP,KR,US);
C08J3/075 (KR);
C08L83/08 (KR);
C08G2210/00 (KR);
C08L2203/02 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
G02B1/043, C08L81/08 (US,EP);
G02B1/043, C08L83/04 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] | Extension states | BA | 15.07.2016 | ME | 15.07.2016 | Title | German: | POLYMER MIT SULFONSÄUREGRUPPEN | [2016/47] | English: | POLYMERS COMPRISING SULFONIC ACID GROUPS | [2016/47] | French: | POLYMÈRES COMPRENANT DES GROUPES ACIDE SULFONIQUE | [2016/47] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 21.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2013109482 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION CARE [US]) | by applicant | US3408429 | US3660545 | US3808178 | US4113224 | US4120570 | US4136250 | US4153641 | US4197266 | EP0080539 | US4740533 | US4910277 | US5011275 | US5034461 | US5070215 | US5244981 | US5314960 | US5321108 | US5331067 | US5371147 | US5387662 | US5451617 | US5539016 | WO9631792 | US5944853 | US5962548 | US5998498 | US6020445 | US2002016383 | US6367929 | WO03022321 | WO03022322 | US2003125498 | US2003162862 | US6822016 | US7249848 | US2008114123 | US7786185 | US2010280146 | US2011237766 | US2013184372 |