EP3099249 - SELF-RETAINING SUTURE DEVICE WITH ASYMMETRIC RETAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/49] | SELF-RETAINING SUTURE DEVICE WITH ASYMMETRIC RETAINERS AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME | ||
[2023/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon, Inc P.O. Box 151 U.S. Route 22 Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDH, SR. David C. 138 Allens Corner Road Flemington, New Jersey 08822 / US | 02 /
ROUSSEAU, Robert A. 736 Geigel Hill Road Ottsville, Pennsylvania 18942 / US | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/49] | Application number, filing date | 15701915.9 | 15.01.2015 | [2016/49] | WO2015US11530 | Priority number, date | US201461931727P | 27.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461931727 P | [2016/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015112416 | Date: | 30.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3099249 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3099249 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/06, A61B17/00 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
A61B17/06166 (EP,CN,KR);
A61B17/06 (RU);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,CN,KR);
A61B2017/06176 (EP,CN,KR);
A61B2017/0618 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] | Extension states | BA | 27.07.2016 | ME | 27.07.2016 | Title | German: | SELBSTHALTENDE NAHTVORRICHTUNG MIT ASYMMETRISCHEN HALTERN | [2023/15] | English: | SELF-RETAINING SUTURE DEVICE WITH ASYMMETRIC RETAINERS | [2023/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUTURE AUTOSTATIQUE AVEC ÉLÉMENTS DE CONTENTION ASYMÉTRIQUES | [2023/15] |
Former [2016/49] | SELBSTHALTENDE NAHTVORRICHTUNG MIT ASYMMETRISCHEN HALTERN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2016/49] | SELF-RETAINING SUTURE DEVICE WITH ASYMMETRIC RETAINERS AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME | ||
Former [2016/49] | DISPOSITIF DE SUTURE AUTOSTATIQUE AVEC ÉLÉMENTS DE CONTENTION ASYMÉTRIQUES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/49] | 27.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.10.2022 | 12.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 05.07.2023 | ES | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | MC | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | ES | 05.07.2023 | |
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | ES | 05.07.2023 | |
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | ES | 05.07.2023 | |
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 05.10.2023 | |
GR | 06.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO03017850 (QUILL MEDICAL INC [US], et al); | [YA]WO2008041265 (PROMOITALIA INTERNAT SRL [IT], et al); | [XAYI]WO2009097556 (ANGIOTECH PHARM INC [CA], et al); | [YA]US2009210006 (COHEN MATTHEW D [US], et al); | [XAI]WO2011139916 (ANGIOTECH PHARM INC [CA], et al) |