EP3099861 - ENGINE AND PUMP CONTROL DEVICE AND WORKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caterpillar SARL 76, Route de Frontenex 1208 Geneva / CH | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHKUBO, Masafumi c/o Caterpillar Japan Ltd. 10-1, Yoga 4-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8530 / JP | 02 /
TADA, Shogo c/o Caterpillar Japan Ltd. 10-1, Yoga 4-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8530 / JP | 03 /
AKIYAMA, Seiichi c/o Caterpillar Japan Ltd. 10-1, Yoga 4-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8530 / JP | 04 /
OZAWA, Yuki c/o Caterpillar Japan Ltd. 10-1, Yoga 4-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8530 / JP | 05 /
HATA, Yoshihiko c/o Caterpillar Japan Ltd. 10-1, Yoga 4-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8530 / JP | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15701970.4 | 29.01.2015 | [2016/49] | WO2015EP51854 | Priority number, date | JP20140015280 | 30.01.2014 Original published format: JP 2014015280 | [2016/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015114061 | Date: | 06.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3099861 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/22, B60W10/06, B60W10/30, B60W30/188, F02D41/02, F04B1/32, F04B49/06, F02D29/04 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
E02F9/2246 (EP,KR,US);
E02F9/2235 (EP,KR,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,KR,US);
B60W10/30 (EP,KR,US);
B60W30/1882 (EP,US);
E02F9/2296 (EP,KR,US);
F02D11/105 (EP,KR,US);
F02D29/04 (EP,KR,US);
F02D31/001 (EP,KR,US);
F04B1/324 (EP,KR,US);
F04B49/065 (EP,KR,US);
F15B11/08 (US);
F15B21/087 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2710/0644 (EP,US);
B60W2710/0666 (EP,US);
B60W2710/0677 (EP,US);
E02F3/32 (US);
F15B2211/20523 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20546 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20553 (US);
F15B2211/275 (US);
F15B2211/6309 (EP,US);
F15B2211/633 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6333 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6651 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6652 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6658 (EP,US);
F15B2211/70 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] | Title | German: | MOTOR UND PUMPENSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG SOWIE ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2016/49] | English: | ENGINE AND PUMP CONTROL DEVICE AND WORKING MACHINE | [2016/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR ET DE POMPE ET ENGIN DE CHANTIER | [2016/49] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/49] | 25.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/37] | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0404540 (CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3 * figure 1 to 4 * * column 7, line 37 - column 8, line 8 * * column 9, line 23 - line 36 * * column 7, line 13 - line 36 * * column 4, line 3 - line 43 * * column 1, line 1 - line 5 * [I] 2; | [X]US4904161 (KAMIDE TAKAO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 5, line 39 - column 7, line 56 * * column 5, line 34 - line 38 * * figure 1 to 3 *; | [A]US2007227137 (NARUSE MASAMI [JP]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]GB2171757 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |