|
16.06.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2021 |
Payment submission rejected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2020 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.07.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2020 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.06.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
12.12.2019 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2019 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.07.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.07.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2017 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2016 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2016 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2016 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2016 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.08.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.06.2016 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.08.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
06.08.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.08.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.08.2015 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |