EP3227792 - METHOD FOR CONVERTING A BINARY DATA STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUND, Johannes Therese-Giehse-Allee 29 81739 München / DE | 02 /
PEINTNER, Daniel Lindenstrasse 5 I-39037 Meransen Mühlbach / IT | [2017/41] | Application number, filing date | 15703246.7 | 26.01.2015 | [2017/41] | WO2015EP51502 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016119817 | Date: | 04.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3227792 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/22 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
G06F40/149 (EP,CN,US);
G06F40/143 (EP,US);
G06F40/146 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UMSETZUNG EINES BINÄREN DATENSTROMS | [2017/41] | English: | METHOD FOR CONVERTING A BINARY DATA STREAM | [2017/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION D'UN FLUX DE DONNÉES BINAIRES | [2017/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 09.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/37] | 05.08.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.09.2020 | 09.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2012171965 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 4, line 8 - line 23; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2014297692 (DOI YUSUKE [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X] - RUMEN KYUSAKOV ET AL, "EXIP: A Framework for Embedded Web Development", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON THE WEB (TWEB), ACM NEW YORK, (20141106), vol. 8, no. 4, doi:10.1145/2665068, ISSN 1559-1131, pages 1 - 29, XP058061318 [X] 1-3 * abstract * * Abschnitt 2.1.1 * * Abschnitt 3.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2665068 | [A] - YUSUKE DOI ET AL, "XML-less EXI with code generation for integration of embedded devices in web based systems", 3RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON THE INTERNET OF THINGS (IOT), 2012, (20121024), doi:10.1109/IOT.2012.6402307, ISBN 978-1-4673-1347-6, pages 76 - 83, XP032297313 [A] 1-3,10-12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IOT.2012.6402307 | [A] - John Schneider ET AL, "Efficient XML Interchange Format 1.0", (20140214), URL: http://www.w3.org/TR/exi/, (20151014), XP055220683 [A] 1,10-12 * abstract * * Abschnitt 8.5.4 * | [A] - SEBASTIAN KABISCH ET AL, "Optimized XML-based Web service generation for service communication in restricted embedded environments", EMERGING TECHNOLOGIES&FACTORY AUTOMATION (ETFA), 2011 IEEE 16TH CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110905), doi:10.1109/ETFA.2011.6059002, ISBN 978-1-4577-0017-0, pages 1 - 8, XP031961321 [A] 1,10-12 * abstract * * Abschnitt 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ETFA.2011.6059002 |