01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
17.05.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
11.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
08.06.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
01.06.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.06.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.06.2018 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
30.05.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
16.02.2018 |
Change - inventor |
|
06.02.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.01.2018 |
Change - French title |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
09.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.09.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.05.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.05.2017 |
First examination report |
|
13.03.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.10.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
28.10.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
14.09.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.08.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.08.2016 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
09.08.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
09.08.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.08.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.10.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.05.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|