EP3107928 - BLOOD BRAIN BARRIER SHUTTLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRESKGARD, Per-Ola Rainenweg 140 CH-4153 Reinach (BL) / CH | 02 /
SCHMUCKI, Roland Erlenmattstrasse 16 CH-4058 Basel / CH | 03 /
URICH, Eduard Basler Strasse 31 79540 Loerrach / DE | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Küng, Peter F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2016/52] | Application number, filing date | 15704558.4 | 17.02.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015EP53244 | Priority number, date | EP20140155687 | 19.02.2014 Original published format: EP 14155687 | [2016/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015124540 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3107928 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3107928 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/08, C07K7/08, A61K47/42, A61K39/395, A61K38/06, A61K38/10, C12N15/09, A61P25/28 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
A61K47/64 (EP,KR,US);
C07K5/0806 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K5/0812 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K38/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K38/10 (EP,CN,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07K16/18 (US);
C07K16/28 (US);
C07K5/0808 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K5/081 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K5/0815 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K5/0817 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K5/0819 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K5/0821 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K5/0823 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLUT-HIRN-SCHRANKE-SHUTTLE | [2019/15] | English: | BLOOD BRAIN BARRIER SHUTTLE | [2016/52] | French: | NAVETTE DE LA BARRIÈRE HÉMATO-ENCÉPHALIQUE | [2016/52] |
Former [2016/52] | BLUT-HIRN-SCHRANKEN-SHUTTLE | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 25.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.01.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 18.01.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.02.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2015 | AL | 04.09.2019 | AT | 04.09.2019 | CY | 04.09.2019 | CZ | 04.09.2019 | DK | 04.09.2019 | EE | 04.09.2019 | ES | 04.09.2019 | FI | 04.09.2019 | HR | 04.09.2019 | IT | 04.09.2019 | LT | 04.09.2019 | LV | 04.09.2019 | MC | 04.09.2019 | MK | 04.09.2019 | MT | 04.09.2019 | NL | 04.09.2019 | PL | 04.09.2019 | RO | 04.09.2019 | RS | 04.09.2019 | SE | 04.09.2019 | SI | 04.09.2019 | SK | 04.09.2019 | SM | 04.09.2019 | TR | 04.09.2019 | BG | 04.12.2019 | NO | 04.12.2019 | GR | 05.12.2019 | IS | 05.01.2020 | PT | 06.01.2020 | IE | 17.02.2020 | LU | 17.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.02.2015 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
TR | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 17.02.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 17.02.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 17.02.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 04.09.2019 | |
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 04.09.2019 | |
NO | 04.12.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0220822 (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * * sequences 20, 42 *; | [XY]US2003104993 (RUEGER DAVID C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,12-16 * the whole document * * Generic sequence 3; page 7, paragraph [0041] * * table II * [Y] 1-16; | [XY]US2004191265 (SCHENERMAN MARK A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,12-14,16 * the whole document * * pages 12-14; table III * [Y] 1-16; | [XY]US2005187147 (NEWMAN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,12-16 * the whole document * * claims 1, 13, 82 * * sequences 5, 1406, 1407 * * claims 135, 136 *[Y] 1-16; | [XY]US2006039929 (FERNANDEZ-SALAS ESTER [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,12-14,16 * the whole document * * page 20, paragraph [179]; sequences 128, 133, 134 * [Y] 1-16; | [XY]WO2007120648 (NEW RIVER PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,12-16 * the whole document * * claim 99 * * sequences 11, 16, 20 * [Y] 1-16; | [XY]CN101497651 (UNIV CAPITAL MEDICAL [CN]) [X] 1-3,5-7,12-16 * the whole document * [Y] 1-16; | [Y]FR2944020 (ETAT FRANCAIS MINISTERE DE LA [FR]) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * * claim 6; sequence 47 * * claim 8; sequences 56, 57, 62, 63 * * claims 1-11 * * page 16, line 5 - page 18, line 7 * * EXEMPLES; page 34, line 20 - page 36 *; | [XY]WO2010121023 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,12-16 * the whole document * * sequence 21 * * page 13, paragraph [0044] * * page 14, paragraph [0050] - page 15, paragraph [0052] * [Y] 1-16; | [XY]US2011003750 (TREGEAR GEOFFREY WILLIAM [AU], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,12-16 * the whole document * * page 3, paragraph [0015] * * page 12, paragraphs [0058]-[0059] * [Y] 1-16; | [XY]WO2011046938 (ONEGLOVE LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,12-16 * (10); page 63 - page 64 * * page 97; table 2 * [Y] 1-16; | [XY]WO2011091304 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-16 * the whole document * * page 16, line 19 - page 18, line 13; sequence 3 * * page 17, line 10 * * page 22, line 32 - page 23, line 12 * * page 29, line 27 * * page 30, line 3 - page 32, line 5 * * page 53, lines 3-25 * * page 57, line 7 - page 70, line 33 * * page 16, line 34 * [Y] 1-16; | [Y]WO2013041238 (SYGNIS BIOSCIENCE GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * * page 61, line 31 - page 66, line 16 *; | [Y] - GONZALEZ ANA MARIA ET AL, "Targeting choroid plexus epithelia and ventricular ependyma for drug delivery to the central nervous system", BMC NEUROSCIENCE, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20110107), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1471-2202-12-4, ISSN 1471-2202, page 4, XP021086692 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2202-12-4 | [YD] - PASQUALINI R ET AL, "Aminopeptidase N is a receptor for tumor-homing peptides and a target for inhibiting angiogenesis", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20000201), vol. 60, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 722 - 727, XP002189748 [YD] 1-16 * the whole document * | [Y] - MATHEW W. SMITH ET AL, "Peptide sequences mediating tropism to intact blood-brain barrier: An in vivo biodistribution study using phage display", PEPTIDES, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20121101), vol. 38, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.peptides.2012.06.019, ISSN 0196-9781, pages 172 - 180, XP055182690 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.peptides.2012.06.019 | [XY] - Alexandre Bastit ET AL, "Novasep Presentation", (20100102), URL: http://biotuesday.fr/files/2010/09/novasep.pdf, (20150626), XP055198553 [X] 1-3,5-7,12-16 * the whole document * [Y] 1-16 | [XY] - Christophe Rousselle ET AL, "Enhanced Delivery of Doxorubicin into the Brain via a Peptide-Vector-Mediated Strategy: Saturation Kinetics and Specificity", Journal of Pharmacology and Experimental Therapeutics, UNITED STATES, (20010101), page 124, URL: http://jpet.aspetjournals.org/content/296/1/124.abstract, (20150626), XP055198653 [X] 1-3,5-7,12-16 * the whole document * [Y] 1-16 |