EP3107889 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HIGH-PURITY GLYCEROL DIMETHACRYLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 45 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNEBEL, Joachim Alsbacher Strasse 11 64665 Alsbach-Hähnlein / DE | 02 /
HERZOG, Volker Seeheimer Strasse 25 a 64297 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
CASPARI, Maik Im Ritterbruch 35 64665 Alsbach-Haehnlein / DE | [2016/52] | Application number, filing date | 15704774.7 | 10.02.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015EP52678 | Priority number, date | DE201410202902 | 18.02.2014 Original published format: DE102014202902 | [2016/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015124458 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3107889 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/56, C07C69/54 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
C07C67/56 (EP,KR,US);
C07C69/602 (KR);
C07D303/12 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/56, C07C69/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOCHREINEM GLYCERINDIMETHACRYLAT | [2016/52] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HIGH-PURITY GLYCEROL DIMETHACRYLATE | [2016/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE DIMÉTHACRYLATE DE GLYCÉROL DE PURETÉ ÉLEVÉE | [2016/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 11.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/43] | 29.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0001854 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-11* claim 1 *; | [IDA]EP0054700 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [ID] 1-7,9-11 * example 1 * [A] 8; | [A]US4797233 (ZINNEN HERMANN A [US]) [A] 1-11 * claim 1 * |