EP3104899 - AIR DECONTAMINATION DEVICE&METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baldry, Lorraine Ingrid 6 Bingham Street London N1 2QQ / GB | [2016/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOLE, Alan Laburnam Cottage Station Road Eckington Pershore Worcestershire WR10 3BB / GB | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | Dolleymores 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [2016/51] | Application number, filing date | 15705053.5 | 10.02.2015 | [2016/51] | WO2015GB50362 | Priority number, date | GB20140002624 | 14.02.2014 Original published format: GB 201402624 | [2016/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015121633 | Date: | 20.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3104899 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/22, B01D53/32, H05H1/24 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
A61L9/22 (EP,GB,US);
A61L9/04 (US);
A61L9/12 (US);
A61L9/16 (GB);
B01D53/32 (US);
B01D53/323 (EP,US);
B01D53/34 (GB);
B01D53/8675 (US);
H05H1/2431 (EP,US);
H05H1/2439 (EP,GB,US);
A61L2209/11 (US);
B01D2255/802 (US);
B01D2257/106 (US);
B01D2257/702 (EP,US);
B01D2257/90 (EP,US);
B01D2257/91 (EP,US);
B01D2258/06 (EP,US);
B01D2259/804 (US);
B01D2259/818 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR LUFTDEKONTAMINATION | [2016/51] | English: | AIR DECONTAMINATION DEVICE&METHOD | [2016/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCONTAMINATION DE L'AIR | [2016/51] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 05.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]GB2468865 (TRI AIR DEVELOPMENTS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,9,17,20,22 * page 2, lines 14-23; figures 4-6 * * page 3, lines 11-12 * * page 18, lines 15-18 * * page 19, lines 3-6 * [A] 13-16[I] 5-8,10-12,18,19,21 |