EP3111719 - FIBRE-RADIO COMMUNICATION NETWORK AND FIBRE-RADIO COMMUNICATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/01] | FIBRE-RADIO COMMUNICATION NETWORK AND APPARATUS AND FIBRE-RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD | ||
[2017/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE Systems PLC 6 Carlton Gardens London SW1Y 5AD / GB | [2017/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PESCOD, Christopher Ralph BAE SYSTEMS ATC Great Baddow West Hanningfield Road Chelmsford Essex CM2 8HN / GB | 02 /
NAWAZ, Shahbaz BAE SYSTEMS ATC Great Baddow West Hanningfield Road Chelmsford Essex CM2 8HN / GB | 03 /
NEWMAN, Mark Trevor BAE SYSTEMS ATC Great Baddow West Hanningfield Road Chelmsford Essex CM2 8HN / GB | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Warwick House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/01] | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department P.O. Box 87 Warwick House Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15705090.7 | 17.02.2015 | [2017/01] | WO2015GB50442 | Priority number, date | GB20140003250 | 25.02.2014 Original published format: GB 201403250 | EP20140275030 | 25.02.2014 Original published format: EP 14275030 | [2017/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015128611 | Date: | 03.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3111719 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3111719 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/08, H04B10/2575 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
H04B10/25753 (EP,US);
H04B10/25752 (US);
H04B10/40 (US);
H04W88/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FASERFUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK UND FASERFUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSGERÄT | [2017/31] | English: | FIBRE-RADIO COMMUNICATION NETWORK AND FIBRE-RADIO COMMUNICATION APPARATUS | [2017/31] | French: | RÉSEAU ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION PAR FIBRE-RADIO | [2017/31] |
Former [2017/01] | FASERFUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ UND FASERFUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2017/01] | FIBRE-RADIO COMMUNICATION NETWORK AND APPARATUS AND FIBRE-RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD | ||
Former [2017/01] | RÉSEAU ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION RADIO-PAR FIBRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION RADIO-PAR FIBRE | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 13.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2015 | AL | 13.12.2017 | AT | 13.12.2017 | CY | 13.12.2017 | CZ | 13.12.2017 | DK | 13.12.2017 | EE | 13.12.2017 | ES | 13.12.2017 | FI | 13.12.2017 | HR | 13.12.2017 | IT | 13.12.2017 | LT | 13.12.2017 | LV | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | MK | 13.12.2017 | NL | 13.12.2017 | PL | 13.12.2017 | PT | 13.12.2017 | RO | 13.12.2017 | RS | 13.12.2017 | SE | 13.12.2017 | SI | 13.12.2017 | SK | 13.12.2017 | SM | 13.12.2017 | IE | 17.02.2018 | LU | 17.02.2018 | MT | 17.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | BG | 13.03.2018 | NO | 13.03.2018 | GR | 14.03.2018 | IS | 13.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 17.02.2015 | |
AT | 13.12.2017 | ||
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MK | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
MT | 17.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 17.02.2015 | |
AT | 13.12.2017 | ||
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
MT | 17.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
MT | 17.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
MT | 17.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
NO | 13.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2010189439 (NOVAK DALMA [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11-15 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0018] * [Y] 9,10; | [XA]DE102010044236 (TECH UNI CAROLO WILHELMINA ZU BRAUNSCHWEIG [DE]) [X] 1,11,13 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0039] *[A] 2-10,12,14,15; | [XAY]WO2013156585 (TYCO ELECTRONICS RAYCHEM BVBA [BE], et al) [X] 1,11,13 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0051] * [A] 2-8,12,14,15 [Y] 9,10; | [A] - M-T ZHOU ET AL, "Radio-over-Fiber Transmission of 1.25-Gigabit Ethernet Signal on 60-GHz Band Subcarrier with Performance Improvement and Wavelength Reuse", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2007 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC 2007), 24-28 JUNE 2007, GLASGOW, UK, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20070601), ISBN 978-1-4244-0353-0, pages 2151 - 2155, XP031125995 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * par. "I. Introduction"; page 2151 - page 2152 * |