06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
03.09.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
02.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
07.02.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
01.02.2020 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
01.02.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
15.01.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2019 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
18.12.2019 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
18.12.2019 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.12.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.12.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.08.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.07.2019 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
27.02.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.01.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
13.10.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.08.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.04.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.02.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.10.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.09.2017 |
First examination report |
|
07.04.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.04.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
20.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.11.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
04.11.2016 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
04.11.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
23.09.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.08.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
22.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|