EP3107933 - MIMETIC PEPTIDES AND THEIR USE IN MEDICINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONSIGLIO NAZIONALE DELLE RICERCHE Piazzale Aldo Moro, 7 00185 Roma / IT | [2020/33] |
Former [2016/52] | For all designated states CONSIGLIO NAZIONALE DELLE RICERCHE Piazzale Aldo Moro, 7 00198 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CATALUCCI, Daniele Via Monzese 20, Ed. D Sc.A 20090 Segrate (MI) / IT | 02 /
CONDORELLI, Gianluigi Medicine Department of the Italian National Research Council (CNR) Piazzale Aldo Moro 7 00185 Roma / IT | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Zaccaro, Elisabetta, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [2020/33] |
Former [2016/52] | Zaccaro, Elisabetta, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 15705512.0 | 23.01.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015EP51376 | Priority number, date | IT2014MI00097 | 24.01.2014 Original published format: IT MI20140097 | [2016/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015110589 | Date: | 30.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3107933 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3107933 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/705, C07K7/04, G01N33/50, A61K38/00, A61P27/02, A61P25/16, A61P9/00, G16C20/90, G16C99/00 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
G01N33/5008 (EP,US);
G01N33/6872 (US);
G16C20/90 (EP,US);
G16C99/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
G01N2333/705 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/52] | C07K14/705, C07K7/04, G01N33/50, A61K38/00, A61P27/02, A61P25/16, A61P9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PEPTID-MIMETIKA UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN MEDIZIN | [2020/10] | English: | MIMETIC PEPTIDES AND THEIR USE IN MEDICINE | [2016/52] | French: | PEPTIDES MIMETIQUES ET LEUR UTILISATION EN MEDECINE | [2020/10] |
Former [2016/52] | MIMETISCHE PEPTIDE UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN IN DER MEDIZIN | ||
Former [2016/52] | PEPTIDES MIMÉTIQUES ET LEUR UTILISATION EN MÉDECINE | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 22.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2015 | AL | 12.08.2020 | CY | 12.08.2020 | CZ | 12.08.2020 | DK | 12.08.2020 | EE | 12.08.2020 | FI | 12.08.2020 | HR | 12.08.2020 | LT | 12.08.2020 | LV | 12.08.2020 | MC | 12.08.2020 | MK | 12.08.2020 | MT | 12.08.2020 | RS | 12.08.2020 | SE | 12.08.2020 | SI | 12.08.2020 | SK | 12.08.2020 | SM | 12.08.2020 | TR | 12.08.2020 | BG | 12.11.2020 | NO | 12.11.2020 | GR | 13.11.2020 | IS | 12.12.2020 | PT | 14.12.2020 | LU | 23.01.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 23.01.2015 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
MK | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
TR | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
LU | 23.01.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 23.01.2015 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
MK | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
LU | 23.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 23.01.2015 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
LU | 23.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 23.01.2015 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
LU | 23.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
LU | 23.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
LU | 23.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 12.08.2020 | |
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 12.08.2020 | |
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 12.08.2020 | |
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002142938 (YAN CHUNHUA [US], et al) [X] 1-3,12-14 * paragraphs [0103] , [0104]; claims 1, 14-19; sequence 2 *; | [X] - UniProt, (20091013), Database accession no. C7TQ54, XP002729771 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | [ ] - S. Link ET AL, "Diversity and Developmental Expression of L-type Calcium Channel 2 Proteins and Their Influence on Calcium Current in Murine Heart", Journal of Biological Chemistry, (20091030), vol. 284, no. 44, doi:10.1074/jbc.M109.045583, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 30129 - 30137, XP055140238 [ ] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M109.045583 | [X] - UniProt, (20040705), Database accession no. Q6TME0, XP002729772 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | [ ] - J. D. Foell, "Molecular heterogeneity of calcium channel -subunits in canine and human heart: evidence for differential subcellular localization", Physiological Genomics, (20040217), vol. 17, no. 2, doi:10.1152/physiolgenomics.00207.2003, ISSN 1094-8341, pages 183 - 200, XP055140225 [ ] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/physiolgenomics.00207.2003 | [A] - J. B. HARRY ET AL, "New Short Splice Variants of the Human Cardiac Cav 2 Subunit: REDEFINING THE MAJOR FUNCTIONAL MOTIFS IMPLEMENTED IN MODULATION OF THE Cav1.2 CHANNEL", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20040831), vol. 279, no. 45, doi:10.1074/jbc.M409523200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 46367 - 46372, XP055140379 [A] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M409523200 | [A] - LI M ET AL, "ION CHANNEL DISEASES OF THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM", CNS DRUG REVIEWS, BRANFORD, CT, US, (20010701), vol. 7, no. 2, ISSN 1080-563X, pages 214 - 240, XP008038476 [A] 7-10,14 * abstract * | [A] - CORRADO ET AL, "Is it time to include ion channel diseases among cardiomyopathies?", JOURNAL OF ELECTROCARDIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, XX, (20051001), vol. 38, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.JELECTROCARD.2005.06.101, ISSN 0022-0736, pages 81 - 87, XP005110131 [A] 7-10,14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jelectrocard.2005.06.101 | by applicant | - CATTERALL, W. A., "Voltage-gated calcium channels", COLD SPRING HARBOR PERSPECTIVES IN BIOLOGY, (2011), vol. 3, page A003947 | - OPATOWSKY, Y.; CHEN, C. C.; CAMPBELL, K. P.; HIRSCH, J. A., "Structural analysis of the voltage-dependent calcium channel beta subunit functional core and its complex with the alpha 1 interaction domain", NEURON, (2004), vol. 42, pages 387 - 399 | - CATALUCCI, D. ET AL., "Akt regulates L-type Ca2+ channel activity by modulating Cavalphal protein stability", THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (2009), vol. 184, pages 923 - 933 | - DI PASQUALE, E. ET AL., "CaMKII inhibition rectifies arrhythmic phenotype in a patient-specific model of catecholaminergic polymorphic ventricular tachycardia", CELL DEATH & DISEASE, (2013), vol. 4, page E843 |