EP3105259 - PRODUCING CATALYST COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/51] | PRODUCING POLYOLEFIN PRODUCTS | ||
[2020/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Univation Technologies, LLC 5555 San Felipe Suite 1950 Houston, TX 77056 / US | [2016/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIX, Francis C. 4015 Rusting Woods Court League City, TX 77059 / US | 02 /
TODD, Alexander D. 203 W. 39th Street Austin, TX 78751 / US | 03 /
HARLAN, Jeff C. 15810 Dunmoor Drive Houston, TX 77059 / US | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/46] |
Former [2016/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 15705881.9 | 10.02.2015 | [2016/51] | WO2015US15130 | Priority number, date | US201461938466P | 11.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461938466 P | US201461938472P | 11.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461938472 P | US201461981291P | 18.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461981291 P | US201461985151P | 28.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461985151 P | US201462032383P | 01.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462032383 P | US201462087911P | 05.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462087911 P | US201462087914P | 05.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462087914 P | US201462088196P | 05.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462088196 P | US201462087905P | 05.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462087905 P | [2016/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015123171 | Date: | 20.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3105259 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3105259 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/6592, C08F210/16, C07F17/00 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,CN,US);
C08F4/65925 (CN,KR,RU,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B27/32 (EP);
C07F17/00 (CN,US);
C08F2/00 (US);
C08F2/34 (US);
C08F210/02 (CN,US);
C08F210/18 (RU);
C08F4/6432 (US);
C08F4/65904 (US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08F4/65916 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08F4/65927 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08F4/76 (US);
C08F210/08 (US);
C08F210/14 (US);
C08F2410/01 (EP);
C08F2410/02 (EP,CN,US);
C08F2420/00 (US);
C08F2420/01 (US);
C08F2420/08 (EP);
C08F2420/12 (EP);
C08F2500/01 (US);
C08F2500/02 (US);
C08F2500/03 (CN);
C08F2500/08 (CN,US);
C08F2500/09 (US);
C08F2500/10 (CN,US);
C08F2500/11 (US);
C08F2500/12 (CN,US);
C08F2500/13 (US);
C08F2500/18 (US);
C08F2800/20 (US);
C08J2323/08 (EP,CN,US);
C08L23/0815 (US);
Y02P20/52 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/02, C08F2/34 (CN);
C08F210/02, C08F210/14 (CN);
C08F210/02, C08F4/65925 (CN);
C08F210/16, C08F2/00 (US,CN,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F2/34 (US,CN,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/10, C08F2500/08, C08F2500/03 (CN,US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F2500/08 (CN);
C08F210/16, C08F2500/10 (CN);
C08F210/16, C08F2500/12 (CN);
C08F210/16, C08F4/65904 (US,EP,CN);
C08F210/16, C08F4/65912 (CN);
C08F210/16, C08F4/65916 (CN);
C08F210/16, C08F4/65925 (CN);
C08F210/16, C08F4/65925, C08F4/65925 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/65925, C08F4/65927 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/65927 (CN);
C08F210/16, C08F210/08, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/04, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/26, C08F2500/31, C08F2500/37 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/08, C08F2500/12 (US,CN);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/10, C08F2500/08 (US,CN,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/18 (EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON KATALYSATORZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2020/23] | English: | PRODUCING CATALYST COMPOSITIONS | [2020/23] | French: | PRODUCTION DE COMPOSITIONS DE CATALYSEUR | [2020/23] |
Former [2016/51] | HERSTELLUNG VON POLYOLEFINPRODUKTEN | ||
Former [2016/51] | PRODUCING POLYOLEFIN PRODUCTS | ||
Former [2016/51] | PRODUCTION DE PRODUITS POLYOLÉFINIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 30.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20195547.3 / EP3816196 | EP20197558.8 / EP3819314 | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.02.2015 | AL | 11.11.2020 | AT | 11.11.2020 | CY | 11.11.2020 | CZ | 11.11.2020 | DK | 11.11.2020 | EE | 11.11.2020 | FI | 11.11.2020 | HR | 11.11.2020 | LT | 11.11.2020 | LV | 11.11.2020 | MC | 11.11.2020 | MK | 11.11.2020 | MT | 11.11.2020 | PL | 11.11.2020 | RO | 11.11.2020 | RS | 11.11.2020 | SE | 11.11.2020 | SI | 11.11.2020 | SK | 11.11.2020 | SM | 11.11.2020 | IE | 10.02.2021 | LU | 10.02.2021 | BG | 11.02.2021 | GB | 11.02.2021 | NO | 11.02.2021 | GR | 12.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | IS | 11.03.2021 | PT | 11.03.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 10.02.2015 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
MK | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GB | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 10.02.2015 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GB | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 10.02.2015 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GB | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GB | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GB | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GB | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 11.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006010139 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * examples 1c,3d,4g * * page 69 - page 83 * * paragraph [00137] - paragraph [00138] *; | [A]WO2010132811 (UNIVATION TECH LLC [US], et al) [A] 1 * catalyst pair I;; table 2 * * page 38 - page 41 *; | [X] - CHIRIK P J ET AL, "PREPARATION OF ANSA-NIOBOCENE AND ANSA-TANTALOCENE OLEFIN HYDRIDE COMPLEXES AS TRANSITION STATE ANALOGUES IN METALLOCENE-CATALYZED OLEFIN POLYMERIZATION", ORGANOMETALLICS, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20030106), vol. 22, no. 1, doi:10.1021/OM020628D, ISSN 0276-7333, pages 172 - 187, XP001169802 [X] 1 * compounds 10a,b; page 183 * * compounds 18a-c, 19a-c; page 184 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om020628d | [X] - GIARDELLO M A ET AL, "Chiral C1-Symmetric Group 4 Metallocenes as Catalysts for Stereoregular alpha-Olefin Polymerization. Metal, Ancillary Ligand, and Counteranion Effects", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19950101), vol. 117, no. 49, doi:10.1021/JA00154A012, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 12114 - 12129, XP007901621 [X] 6 * page 12116, column right, paragraph four * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00154a012 | [X] - E. SAMUEL ET AL, "Pi-Cyclopentadienyl and pi-Indenyl Compounds of Titanium, Zirconium and Hafnium Containing sigma-Bonded Organic Substituents", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1973), vol. 95, pages 6263 - 6267, XP002739867 [X] 6 * compound 14; page 6266 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00800a018 | [A] - G.M. WILMES ET AL., "Effects of Ligand Substitutions on the Rotation Rate of Indenyl Ligands in Bis(2-arylindenyl)zirconocenes by NMR Line-Shape Analysis and Relaxation in the Rotating Frame", ORGANOMETALLICS, (2004), vol. 23, pages 2405 - 2411, XP002739868 [A] 1 * compound 2c; page 2410 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om034166v | by applicant | WO9609328 |