EP3061320 - A LIGHT EMITTING MODULE, A LAMP, A LUMINAIRE AND A METHOD OF ILLUMINATING AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIKMET, Rifat Ata Mustafa c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VAN BOMMEL, Ties c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/34] |
Former [2016/35] | 01 /
HIKMET, Rifat Ata Mustafa c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
VAN BOMMEL, Ties c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/15] | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle Philips Lighting B.V. Philips Lighting Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2016/35] | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle Philips Lighting B.V. Philips Lighting Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 15706017.9 | 23.02.2015 | [2016/35] | WO2015EP53671 | Priority number, date | EP20140156148 | 21.02.2014 Original published format: EP 14156148 | [2016/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015124755 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3061320 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3061320 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08, H01L33/50, F21V9/10, F21V9/16, F21W131/20, C09K11/00, F21V33/00, F21K9/00, F21S8/06, H01L25/075, F21Y101/00, F21Y115/10, F21Y113/13 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
H01L25/0753 (EP,CN,US);
C09K11/00 (EP,US);
F21K9/232 (EP,US);
F21K9/64 (EP,US);
F21S2/005 (CN);
F21V9/08 (EP,US);
F21V9/38 (EP,US);
F21V9/45 (EP,US);
H01L33/504 (EP,US);
H05B45/20 (EP,US);
F21S8/06 (EP,US);
F21V33/006 (EP,US);
F21Y2113/13 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/35] | H05B33/08, H01L33/50, F21V9/10, F21V9/16, F21W131/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDES MODUL, LAMPE, LEUCHTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR BELEUCHTUNG EINES OBJEKTS | [2016/35] | English: | A LIGHT EMITTING MODULE, A LAMP, A LUMINAIRE AND A METHOD OF ILLUMINATING AN OBJECT | [2016/35] | French: | MODULE D'ÉMISSION DE LUMIÈRE, LAMPE, LUMINAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉCLAIRAGE D'UN OBJET | [2016/48] |
Former [2016/35] | MODULE D'ÉMISSION DE LUMIÈRE, LAMPE, DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉCLAIRAGE D'UN OBJET | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 07.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2015 | AL | 12.04.2017 | AT | 12.04.2017 | CY | 12.04.2017 | CZ | 12.04.2017 | DK | 12.04.2017 | EE | 12.04.2017 | FI | 12.04.2017 | HR | 12.04.2017 | LT | 12.04.2017 | LV | 12.04.2017 | MC | 12.04.2017 | MK | 12.04.2017 | NL | 12.04.2017 | PT | 12.04.2017 | RO | 12.04.2017 | RS | 12.04.2017 | SE | 12.04.2017 | SK | 12.04.2017 | SM | 12.04.2017 | TR | 12.04.2017 | BG | 12.07.2017 | NO | 12.07.2017 | GR | 13.07.2017 | IS | 12.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 23.02.2015 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 23.02.2015 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 12.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003227022 (HWANG CHIN-MAU JAMES [TW], et al) [A] 1-15* page 1, paragraphs 5, 15 , 18 *; | [A]EP2190035 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0041] - [0044]; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US2013258636 (RETTKE REUBEN [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0063] - [0064] * * abstract * |