EP3116545 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ANTIBACTERIAL AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wockhardt Limited D-4, MIDC Industrial Area Chikalthana Aurangabad 431006 / IN | [2017/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHAGWAT, Sachin Row House No.C-2 "Nilgiris" Khivansara Park(E) Behind Ramayana Cultural Hall, Ulkanagari, M.S Aurangabad 431005 . / IN | 02 /
PATEL, Mahesh Vithalbhai Plot No. 157 Opp. Saint Meera School N-3 CIDCO Aurangabad Maharashtra 431003 / IN | [2017/03] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2017/03] | Application number, filing date | 15706530.1 | 14.01.2015 | [2017/03] | WO2015IB50267 | Priority number, date | IN2014MUM859 | 14.03.2014 Original published format: IN 859MU2014 | [2017/16] |
Former [2017/03] | INMM08592014 | 14.03.2014 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015136387 | Date: | 17.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3116545 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K31/439, A61P31/04 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/439 (EP,US);
A61K31/437 (KR);
A61K31/43 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (KR);
A61K9/14 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT ANTIBAKTERIELLEN WIRKSTOFFEN | [2017/03] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ANTIBACTERIAL AGENTS | [2017/03] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES COMPRENANT DES AGENTS ANTIBACTÉRIENS | [2017/03] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 13.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2013038330 (WOCKHARDT LTD [IN], et al) [Y] 1-27 * abstract * * page 6 - page 10 * * page 2, paragraph last three * * page 21 - page 22 *; | [Y]WO2013014496 (WOCKHARDT LTD [IN], et al) [Y] 1-27 * page 2 * * page 7 * * page 13 - page 14 * * claims 1-16 * | by applicant | - S. M. BERGE ET AL., J. PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 |