|
10.10.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
220 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
220 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
13.09.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
220 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
220 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2016 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.09.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
153 |
|
13.08.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.08.2015 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
222 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
141 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
71 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |