Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9410029 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2016 | B2 | US2015225543 | 13.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461938071 | 10.02.2014 | US201514615941 | 06.02.2015 | US201461938066 | 10.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9447257 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2016 | B2 | US2015225542 | 13.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461938071 | 10.02.2014 | US201514615836 | 06.02.2015 | US201461938066 | 10.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102388576B | Global Dossier | 19.04.2022 | B1 | KR20160122205 | 21.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461938071 | 10.02.2014 | US201514615941 | 06.02.2015 | US201514615836 | 06.02.2015 | WO2015US15121 | 10.02.2015 | US201461938066 | 10.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102314502B | Global Dossier | 18.10.2021 | B1 | KR20160122781 | 24.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461938071 | 10.02.2014 | US201514615941 | 06.02.2015 | US201514615836 | 06.02.2015 | US201461938066 | 10.02.2014 | WO2015US15118 | 10.02.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3105279 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2018 | B1 | EP3105279 | 21.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461938071 | 10.02.2014 | US201514615941 | 06.02.2015 | US201514615836 | 06.02.2015 | WO2015US15121 | 10.02.2015 | US201461938066 | 10.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105960434B | Global Dossier | 06.04.2018 | B | CN105960434 | 21.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461938071 | 10.02.2014 | US201514615941 | 06.02.2015 | US201514615836 | 06.02.2015 | WO2015US15121 | 10.02.2015 | US201461938066 | 10.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105960429B | Global Dossier | 10.04.2018 | B | CN105960429 | 21.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461938071 | 10.02.2014 | US201514615941 | 06.02.2015 | US201514615836 | 06.02.2015 | US201461938066 | 10.02.2014 | WO2015US15118 | 10.02.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3105278 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2018 | B1 | EP3105278 | 21.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461938071 | 10.02.2014 | US201514615941 | 06.02.2015 | US201514615836 | 06.02.2015 | US201461938066 | 10.02.2014 | WO2015US15118 | 10.02.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015120426 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461938071 | 10.02.2014 | US201514615941 | 06.02.2015 | US201514615836 | 06.02.2015 | US201461938066 | 10.02.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015120425 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461938071 | 10.02.2014 | US201514615941 | 06.02.2015 | US201514615836 | 06.02.2015 | US201461938066 | 10.02.2014 |