06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
24.09.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
03.09.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
19.02.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
04.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
17.07.2020 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
17.07.2020 |
Change - inventor |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
13.03.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
11.03.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
09.03.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.03.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.01.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.10.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.05.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.02.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.11.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.09.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.07.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.03.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.03.2018 |
First examination report |
|
30.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] |
07.03.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.10.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] |
21.10.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] |
09.09.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.08.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
12.08.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|