EP3094610 - ONE-HAND OPERATED GLASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roland Iten Mechanical Luxury SA Rue Pierre-Jolissaint 35 2610 St-Imier / CH | [2020/34] |
Former [2016/47] | For all designated states Roland Iten Mechanical Luxury SA Route de Lausanne 68 1052 Le Mont-sur-Lausanne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITEN, Roland (Mechanical Luxury SA) Rue Pierre-Jolissaint 35 2610 St-Imier / CH | [2020/34] |
Former [2016/47] | 01 /
ITEN, Roland Route de Lausanne 68 CH-1052 Le Mont-sur-Lausanne / CH | Representative(s) | Grosfillier, Philippe André Roland SA IP Attorneys & Services Avenue Collonges 21 1004 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | Grosfillier, Philippe ANDRE ROLAND S.A. P.O. Box 5107 1002 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 15707417.0 | 13.01.2015 | [2016/47] | WO2015IB50249 | Priority number, date | CH20140002714 | 13.01.2014 Original published format: CH 27142014 | CH20140054814 | 09.04.2014 Original published format: CH 548142014 | [2016/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015104697 | Date: | 16.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3094610 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3094610 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C05C5/00 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
G02C5/001 (EP,US);
G02C5/2263 (US);
G02C5/14 (US);
G02C5/146 (EP,US);
G02C5/16 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIT EINER HAND BEDIENBARE BRILLE | [2016/47] | English: | ONE-HAND OPERATED GLASSES | [2016/47] | French: | LUNETTES MANIPULABLES D'UNE SEULE MAIN | [2016/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 06.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2015 | AL | 15.04.2020 | AT | 15.04.2020 | CY | 15.04.2020 | CZ | 15.04.2020 | DK | 15.04.2020 | EE | 15.04.2020 | ES | 15.04.2020 | FI | 15.04.2020 | HR | 15.04.2020 | LT | 15.04.2020 | LV | 15.04.2020 | MC | 15.04.2020 | MK | 15.04.2020 | MT | 15.04.2020 | NL | 15.04.2020 | PL | 15.04.2020 | RO | 15.04.2020 | RS | 15.04.2020 | SE | 15.04.2020 | SI | 15.04.2020 | SK | 15.04.2020 | SM | 15.04.2020 | BG | 15.07.2020 | NO | 15.07.2020 | GR | 16.07.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | GB | 13.01.2021 | IE | 13.01.2021 | IT | 13.01.2021 | LU | 13.01.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 13.01.2015 | |
AL | 15.04.2020 | ||
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CY | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
MK | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LU | 13.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 13.01.2015 | |
AL | 15.04.2020 | ||
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CY | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LU | 13.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 13.01.2015 | |
AL | 15.04.2020 | ||
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LU | 13.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LU | 13.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.01.2021 | ||
LU | 13.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.01.2021 | ||
LU | 13.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 13.01.2021 | ||
LU | 13.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 13.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 15.04.2020 | |
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 15.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE1215956 (DUEREN PETER [DE]) [X] 1,7 * the whole document * [I] 8; | [XI]US5764336 (PORSCHE FERDINAND ALEXANDER [AT], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 26 - column 4, line 16; figure 2 *[I] 8; | [XI]WO02071129 (TRIBUIANI SALVATORE [FR]) [X] 1,7 * page 9, line 10 - line 32; figures 4-6 * [I] 8 |