EP3105775 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUTOMATED OPTIMIZATION OF A MULTI-MODE INDUCTIVELY COUPLED PLASMA MASS SPECTROMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PerkinElmer Health Sciences, Inc. 940 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2016/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAZARGAN, Samad 14 Mercer Drive Brampton, Ontario L6X 1B4 / CA | 02 /
BADIEI, Hamid 65 Bordeaux Drive Woodbridge, Ontario L4L 3C3 / CA | 03 /
PATEL, Pritesh 629 Aspen Road Pickering, Ontario L1V 3T2 / CA | [2019/46] |
Former [2016/51] | 01 /
BAZARGAN, Samad 18 Harding Boulevard Unit 205 Richmond Hill, Ontario L4C 0T3 / CA | ||
02 /
BADIEI, Hamid 65 Bordeaux Drive Woodbridge, Ontario L4L 3C3 / CA | |||
03 /
PATEL, Pritesh 629 Aspen Road Pickering, Ontario L1V 3T2 / CA | Representative(s) | Wilson, Justin Scott Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/46] | Wilson, Justin Scott Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2016/51] | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15707837.9 | 13.02.2015 | [2016/51] | WO2015US15875 | Priority number, date | US201461940349P | 14.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461940349 P | [2016/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015123555 | Date: | 20.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3105775 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3105775 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/00, // H01J49/10 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
H01J49/0031 (EP,US);
H01J49/0009 (US);
H01J49/0027 (US);
H01J49/061 (US);
H01J49/105 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/51] | H01J49/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISIERTEN OPTIMIERUNG EINES MULTIMODALEN INDUKTIV GEKOPPELTEN PLASMAMASSENSPEKTROMETERS | [2016/51] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUTOMATED OPTIMIZATION OF A MULTI-MODE INDUCTIVELY COUPLED PLASMA MASS SPECTROMETER | [2016/51] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉS POUR L'OPTIMISATION AUTOMATISÉE D'UN SPECTROMÈTRE DE MASSE À SOURCE MULTI-MODE DE TYPE PLASMA À COUPLAGE INDUCTIF | [2019/29] |
Former [2016/51] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉS POUR L'OPTIMISATION AUTOMATISÉE D'UN SPECTROMÈTRE DE MASSE À PLASMA COUPLÉ INDUCTIVEMENT MULTIMODAL | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 30.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.02.2015 | AL | 13.11.2019 | AT | 13.11.2019 | CY | 13.11.2019 | CZ | 13.11.2019 | DK | 13.11.2019 | EE | 13.11.2019 | ES | 13.11.2019 | FI | 13.11.2019 | HR | 13.11.2019 | IT | 13.11.2019 | LT | 13.11.2019 | LV | 13.11.2019 | MC | 13.11.2019 | MK | 13.11.2019 | MT | 13.11.2019 | NL | 13.11.2019 | PL | 13.11.2019 | RO | 13.11.2019 | RS | 13.11.2019 | SE | 13.11.2019 | SI | 13.11.2019 | SK | 13.11.2019 | SM | 13.11.2019 | TR | 13.11.2019 | BG | 13.02.2020 | IE | 13.02.2020 | LU | 13.02.2020 | NO | 13.02.2020 | GR | 14.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | FR | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | IS | 13.03.2020 | PT | 13.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 13.02.2015 | |
AL | 13.11.2019 | ||
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
MT | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
TR | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
IE | 13.02.2020 | ||
LU | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
FR | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
IE | 13.02.2020 | ||
LU | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
FR | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
IE | 13.02.2020 | ||
LU | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
FR | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
LU | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
LU | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
LU | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 13.02.2020 | Cited in | International search | [YD]US2012091331 (BADIEI HAMID [CA], et al) [YD] 2,15,30 * the whole document *; | [XYI] - "Agilent 7500 ICP-MS ChemStation (G1834B) Operator's Manual", (20050101), URL: http://snri.ucmerced.edu/files/public/documents/7500_ICPMS_ChemStation%28G1834B%29_Operators_Manual_G3270%2090112.pdf, (20150422), XP055184896 [X] 1,3,6,11,12,14,16-18,21,26,27,29,31,34,39,40 * the whole document * [Y] 2,15,30 [I] 4,5,7-10,13,19,20,22-25,28,32,33,35-38,41 | [A] - "Agilent ICP-MS Journal", (20111101), URL: http://www.chem.agilent.com/Library/periodicals/Public/5990-9407EN.pdf, (20150421), XP055184642 [A] 11,12,26,27,39,40 * page 2 * | Examination | US2013151190 | - Vicki Barwick ET AL, "Best Practice Guide for Generating Mass Spectra", ISBN 978-0-948926-24-2, (20061201), URL: https://www.rsc.org/images/MS2new_tcm18-102519.pdf, (20190523), XP055591423 | - Anonymous, "Software Reference Guide ELAN 3.4 ICP-MS Instrument Control Software", (20080901), pages 85 - 108, URL: http://www.ecs.umass.edu/eve/facilities/equipment/ICPMS/ELAN%20Software%20Guide.pdf, (20190523), XP055591432 | by applicant | US6140638 | US6627912 | US8426804 | WO2011US26463 |