Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3099355 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3099355



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(46)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 160
18.01.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
26.03.2018 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
15.02.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.01.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.01.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
18.01.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
18.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.11.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
21.11.2017 Submission concerning change of applicant's address Search / examination 2
02.11.2017 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 3
19.09.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.09.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.09.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.09.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 16
19.09.2017 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 16
14.08.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
06.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.03.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
06.03.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
06.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.11.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
06.09.2016 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
02.09.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.09.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.09.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.09.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.08.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
15.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.07.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
10.06.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
25.08.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
06.08.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
06.08.2015 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 17
11.06.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 2
11.06.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
11.06.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 2
08.04.2015 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
27.02.2015 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
27.02.2015 Claims International Searching Authority 2
27.02.2015 Description International Searching Authority 10
27.02.2015 Drawings International Searching Authority 4