EP3111284 - INPUT CIRCUIT THAT CAN BE MADE REDUNDANT, INPUT CIRCUIT UNIT HAVING AT LEAST ONE INPUT CIRCUIT, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH AN INPUT CIRCUIT UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2017/01] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIESBAUM, Wilhelm Nansenstrasse 30 76870 Kandel / DE | [2017/01] | Application number, filing date | 15708149.8 | 25.02.2015 | [2017/01] | WO2015EP53865 | Priority number, date | DE201410203429 | 26.02.2014 Original published format: DE102014203429 | [2017/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015128336 | Date: | 03.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3111284 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3111284 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
G06F13/4022 (EP,US);
G05B19/0423 (EP,CN,US);
G06F13/4027 (EP,US);
G05B2219/21123 (EP,CN,US)
| Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REDUNDIERBARE EINGANGSSCHALTUNG, EINGANGSSCHALTUNGSEINHEIT MIT MINDESTENS EINER EINGANGSSCHALTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER SOLCHEN EINGANGSSCHALTUNGSEINHEIT | [2017/01] | English: | INPUT CIRCUIT THAT CAN BE MADE REDUNDANT, INPUT CIRCUIT UNIT HAVING AT LEAST ONE INPUT CIRCUIT, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH AN INPUT CIRCUIT UNIT | [2017/01] | French: | CIRCUIT D'ENTRÉE À REDONDANCE, UNITÉ DE CIRCUIT D'ENTRÉE COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN CIRCUIT D'ENTRÉE ET PROCÉDÉ SERVANT À FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE UNITÉ DE CIRCUIT D'ENTRÉE DE CE TYPE | [2017/01] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 11.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 29.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2015 | AL | 04.12.2019 | CY | 04.12.2019 | CZ | 04.12.2019 | DK | 04.12.2019 | EE | 04.12.2019 | ES | 04.12.2019 | FI | 04.12.2019 | HR | 04.12.2019 | LT | 04.12.2019 | LV | 04.12.2019 | MC | 04.12.2019 | MK | 04.12.2019 | MT | 04.12.2019 | NL | 04.12.2019 | PL | 04.12.2019 | RO | 04.12.2019 | RS | 04.12.2019 | SE | 04.12.2019 | SI | 04.12.2019 | SK | 04.12.2019 | SM | 04.12.2019 | TR | 04.12.2019 | AT | 25.02.2020 | IE | 25.02.2020 | LU | 25.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | BG | 04.03.2020 | NO | 04.03.2020 | GR | 05.03.2020 | IS | 04.04.2020 | PT | 29.04.2020 | [2022/32] | Cited in | International search | [A]US6147520 (KOTHANDARAMAN MAKESHWAR [US], et al) [A] 1-4,7* column 1, lines 29-48; figure 1 *; | [I]EP2461221 (AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN [DE]) [I] 1-8 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0032] - [0035] - [0038] , [0042]; figures 5-7 *; | [A]US2012280327 (CANU ANTOINE PHILIPPE MARIE [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0035] , [0037] , [0086] - [0097]; figure 8 * | by applicant | WO2006127373 | DE102008043199 |