EP3116552 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS VIRUS INACTIVATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMD Millipore Corporation 400 Summit Drive Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [2022/24] |
Former [2017/03] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 1 51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOBEDANN, Martin Dorfheidestrasse 32A 51069 Köln / DE | 02 /
KLUTZ, Stephan Lucasstr. 2a 51379 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
KURT, Safa Kutup Im Grubenfeld 20 44135 Dortmund / DE | [2017/03] | Representative(s) | Merck Patent Association Merck Patent GmbH 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/03] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 15708210.8 | 06.03.2015 | [2017/03] | WO2015EP54698 | Priority number, date | EP20140158845 | 11.03.2014 Original published format: EP 14158845 | [2017/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015135844 | Date: | 17.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3116552 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/10, B01J3/04, C02F1/32 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
A61L2/10 (EP,US);
A61L2/00 (RU);
A61L2/0035 (KR);
A61L2/0088 (US);
A61L2/26 (KR);
A61L2202/15 (US);
A61L2202/21 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN VIRUSINAKTIVIERUNG | [2017/03] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS VIRUS INACTIVATION | [2017/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'INACTIVATION CONTINUE DE VIRUS | [2017/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 30.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2530648 (CAHENZLI JR MARTIN T, et al); | [X]EP0378716 (TUCKER ROBERT E); | [XI]WO9826236 (RTI INC [US]); | [XI]US2006162912 (PRASAD NIGAM KRISHNA D [IN]); |