Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017004933 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20140151 | 03.02.2014 | WO2015IB50775 | 02.02.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106163361B | Global Dossier | 19.02.2019 | B | CN106163361 | 23.11.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI20140151 | 03.02.2014 | WO2015IB50775 | 02.02.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3104763 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2018 | B1 | EP3104763 | 21.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20140151 | 03.02.2014 | WO2015IB50775 | 02.02.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3104763T | 31.10.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20140151 | 03.02.2014 | EP15708325 | 02.02.2015 | WO2015IB50775 | 02.02.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015121772 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20140151 | 03.02.2014 |