EP3102429 - ROLLING DEVICE, A PIECE OF FURNITURE COMPRISING A ROLLING DEVICE AND A USE OF THE ROLLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wheel.me AS Karenslyst allé 57 0277 Oslo / NO | [2023/48] |
Former [2016/50] | For all designated states Wheel.me AS Fürstenga 16 1367 Snarøya / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIBAKKEN, Rolf Postboks 413 N-9991 Båtsfjord / NO | [2016/50] | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [2016/50] | Application number, filing date | 15708337.9 | 06.02.2015 | [2016/50] | WO2015IB50907 | Priority number, date | NO20140000145 | 06.02.2014 Original published format: NO 20140145 | NO20140000520 | 28.04.2014 Original published format: NO 20140520 | [2016/50] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015118492 | Date: | 13.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3102429 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3102429 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3102429 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60B33/00, B60B33/06, B60B33/08 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
B60B33/063 (EP,KR,US);
B60B33/06 (RU);
B60B33/0063 (EP,KR,US);
B60B33/0015 (US);
B60B33/0047 (US);
B60B33/0089 (US);
B60B33/0092 (US);
B60B33/08 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B60B2200/20 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROLLVORRICHTUNG, MÖBELSTÜCK MIT EINER ROLLVORRICHTUNG UND VERWENDUNG DER ROLLVORRICHTUNG | [2016/50] | English: | ROLLING DEVICE, A PIECE OF FURNITURE COMPRISING A ROLLING DEVICE AND A USE OF THE ROLLING DEVICE | [2016/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE ROULEMENT, MEUBLE COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE ROULEMENT ET UTILISATION DU DISPOSITIF DE ROULEMENT | [2016/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 06.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.04.2019 | 29.02.2020 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.2020 | 28.02.2021 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 15.11.2023 | |
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2671242 (LEWIS GILBERT L); | [XI]US2937879 (JEAN LION); | [X]US4108455 (JAMES VARNELL L); | [A]US4660994 (MASCIARELLI CAMILLO [US]) | Examination | JPS6024685U | DE102004030113 | WO2011023820 | by applicant | NO316760B |