|
28.11.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2023 |
Communication concerning a request to change bibliographic data after the decision to grant/decision to maintain the patent in a |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Letter concerning the grant and printing fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.07.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
21.07.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
31.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.05.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
31.05.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
31.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.01.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.01.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2021 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.2020 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2019 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2016 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.08.2016 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.08.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.06.2016 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
08.06.2016 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.06.2016 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.06.2016 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.06.2016 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
09.02.2016 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.09.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
01.09.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2015 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Notification of defects in the demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
11.06.2015 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.06.2015 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
05.06.2015 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
05.06.2015 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
05.06.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.06.2015 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
15 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
7 |