02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
17.11.2023 |
Correction of patent specification |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
27.10.2023 |
Change - applicant |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
13.10.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
07.10.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.10.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.10.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
20.07.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.02.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.02.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.01.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.01.2022 |
First examination report |
|
29.05.2021 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
29.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2021 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.05.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
01.05.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.04.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.04.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
29.04.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.02.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.04.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
21.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.11.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
11.11.2016 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
11.11.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
18.10.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
18.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.09.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|