Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015118493 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NO20140145 | 06.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10759222 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2020 | B2 | US2016339742 | 24.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NO20140520 | 28.04.2014 | WO2015IB50907 | 06.02.2015 | NO20140145 | 06.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102296147B | Global Dossier | 31.08.2021 | B1 | KR20160118334 | 11.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | NO20140520 | 28.04.2014 | WO2015IB50907 | 06.02.2015 | NO20140145 | 06.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6774336B | Global Dossier | 21.10.2020 | B2 | JP2017513750 | 01.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | NO20140520 | 28.04.2014 | WO2015IB50907 | 06.02.2015 | NO20140145 | 06.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106068191B | Global Dossier | 11.09.2018 | B | CN106068191 | 02.11.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | NO20140520 | 28.04.2014 | WO2015IB50907 | 06.02.2015 | NO20140145 | 06.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2937860 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2021 | C | CA2937860 | 13.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NO20140520 | 28.04.2014 | WO2015IB50907 | 06.02.2015 | NO20140145 | 06.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3102429 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2023 | B8 | EP3102429 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2023 | C0 | EP3102429 | 15.11.2023 | B1 | EP3102429 | 14.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NO20140520 | 28.04.2014 | WO2015IB50907 | 06.02.2015 | NO20140145 | 06.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2964594T | 08.04.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | NO20140520 | 28.04.2014 | WO2015IB50907 | 06.02.2015 | NO20140145 | 06.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20150176 | 07.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NO20140145 | 06.02.2014 | NO20150176 | 06.02.2015 | NO20150082 | 17.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2666097 | 05.09.2018 | C2 | RU2016135026 | 19.06.2018 | A3 | RU2016135026 | 13.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | NO20140520 | 28.04.2014 | WO2015IB50907 | 06.02.2015 | NO20140145 | 06.02.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015118492 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NO20140520 | 28.04.2014 | NO20140145 | 06.02.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019147549 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | NO20140520 | 28.04.2014 | NO20140145 | 06.02.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20140520 | 30.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NO20140520 | 28.04.2014 | NO20140145 | 06.02.2014 |