EP3102429 - ROLLING DEVICE, A PIECE OF FURNITURE COMPRISING A ROLLING DEVICE AND A USE OF THE ROLLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 15.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | New entry: Payment of renewal fee | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Wheel.me AS Karenslyst allé 57 0277 Oslo / NO | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIBAKKEN, Rolf Postboks 413 N-9991 Båtsfjord / NO | [2016/50] | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 15708337.9 | 06.02.2015 | [2016/50] | WO2015IB50907 | Procedural language | EN | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 14.12.2023 | Date of request for unitary effect [2024/04] | 21.12.2023 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2024/04] | 21.12.2023 | Date of registration [2024/04] | 15.11.2023 | Date of legal effect [2024/04] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 21.12.2023 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2024/04] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3102429 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3102429 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | [2023/51] | Renewal fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2024 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 10 |