EP3116546 - COMBINATION COMPRISING A BTK INHIBITOR AND AN AKT INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2017/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Rakesh 1250 South Collegeville Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 02 /
ROBELL, Kimberly A. 1250 South Collegeville Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | [2017/03] | Representative(s) | Conroy, John Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/03] | Rudge, Sewkian, et al Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 15708605.9 | 24.02.2015 | [2017/03] | WO2015IB51380 | Priority number, date | US201461951640P | 12.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461951640 P | [2017/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015136398 | Date: | 17.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3116546 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K31/4155, A61K31/519, A61P35/00, A61P35/02 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/519 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/4155 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2300/00 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4155, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] | Title | German: | KOMBINATION AUS EINEM BTK-INHIBITOR UND EINEM AKT-INHIBITOR | [2017/03] | English: | COMBINATION COMPRISING A BTK INHIBITOR AND AN AKT INHIBITOR | [2017/03] | French: | COMBINAISON COMPRENANT UN INHIBITEUR DE BTK ET UN INHIBITEUR D'ATK | [2017/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 01.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/04] | 09.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2010088331 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-26,53 * claims 1, 10, 21 *; | [Y] - AKINTUNDE AKINLEYE ET AL, "Ibrutinib and novel BTK inhibitors in clinical development", JOURNAL OF HEMATOLOGY & ONCOLOGY, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LONDON UK, (20130819), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1756-8722-6-59, ISSN 1756-8722, page 59, XP021162128 [Y] 1-26,53 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1756-8722-6-59 | [Y] - SPENCER ANDREW ET AL, "Novel AKT Inhibitor GSK2110183 Shows Favorable Safety, Pharmacokinetics, and Clinical Activity in Multiple Myeloma. Preliminary Results From a Phase I First-Time-In-Human Study", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (201111), Database accession no. PREV201200219138, XP002738038 [Y] 1-26,53 * abstract * | [ ] - BLOOD, 53RD ANNUAL MEETING AND EXPOSITION OF THE AMERICAN-SOCIETY-OF-HEMATOLOGY (ASH); SAN DIEGO, CA, USA; DECEMBER 10 -13, 2011, (201111), vol. 118, no. 21, ISSN 0006-4971(print), page 808 | [A] - JAIKRIT BHUTANI ET AL, "Akt inhibitors: mechanism of action and implications for anticancer therapeutics", INFECTIOUS AGENTS AND CANCER, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LO, (20131213), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1750-9378-8-49, ISSN 1750-9378, page 49, XP021171563 [A] 1-26,53 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1750-9378-8-49 | by applicant | US5681835 | US5877219 | US6207716 | US6268391 | WO2008098104 | US7576209 | US2010197754 | WO2011152351 | WO2012020008 | WO2012156334 | WO2012170976 | US2013018032 | WO2013010869 | WO2013010380 | WO2013063401 | WO2013067260 | WO2013081016 | WO2013133367 | WO2013161848 | WO2013191965 | - J. Q. CHEUNG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1992), vol. 89, pages 9267 - 9271 | - J. Q. CHEUNG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1996), vol. 93, pages 3636 - 3641 | - NAKATANI ET AL., J. BIOL.CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 21528 - 21532 | - BELLACOSA ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1995), vol. 64, pages 280 - 285 | - SUN ET AL., AM. J. PATHOL., (2001), vol. 159, pages 431 - 7 | - LI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 275, pages 1943 - 1947 | - STAMBOLIC ET AL., CELL, (1998), vol. 95, pages 29 - 39 | - SUN ET AL., PROC. NATI. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1999), vol. 96, pages 6199 - 6204 | - LIAW ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1997), vol. 16, pages 64 - 67 | - GULDBERG ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 57, pages 3660 - 3663 | - RISINGER ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 57, pages 4736 - 4738 | - PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1986), vol. 3, no. 6, page 318 | - MARKMAN ET AL., YALE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, (1991), vol. 64, page 583 | - MCGUIRE ET AL., ANN. INTEM, MED., (1989), vol. 111, page 273 | - HOLMES ET AL., J. NAT. CANCER INST., (1991), vol. 83, page 1797 | - EINZIG, PROC. AM. SOC. CLIN. ONCOL., pages 20 - 46 | - FORASTIRE, SEM. ONCOL., (1990), vol. 20, page 56 | - WOO, NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, page 750 | - KEARNS, C.M., SEMINARS IN ONCOLOGY, (1995), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 16 - 23 | - KATH, JOHN C., EXP. OPIN. THER. PATENTS, (2000), vol. 10, no. 6, pages 803 - 818 | - SHAWVER ET AL., DDT, (199702), vol. 2, no. 2 | - SINH, S.; COREY, S.J., JOURNAL OF HEMATOTHERAPY AND STEM CELL RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 465 - 80 | - BOLEN, J.B.; BRUGGE, J.S., ANNUAL REVIEW OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 15, pages 371 - 404 | - SMITHGALL, T.E., JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGICAL AND TOXICOLOGICAL METHODS, (1995), vol. 34, no. 3, pages 125 - 32 | - YAMAMOTO, T.; TAYA, S.; KAIBUCHI, K., JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 126, no. 5, pages 799 - 803 | - BRODT, P; SAMANI, A.; NAVAB, R., BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (2000), vol. 60, pages 1101 - 1107 | - MASSAGUE, J.; WEIS-GARCIA, F., CANCER SURVEYS, (1996), vol. 27, pages 41 - 64 | - PHILIP, P.A.; HARRIS, A.L., CANCER TREATMENT AND RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 78, pages 3 - 27 | - LACKEY, K. ET AL., BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2000), vol. 10, pages 223 - 226 | - MARTINEZ-LACACI, L. ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (2000), vol. 88, no. 1, pages 44 - 52 | - ABRAHAM, R.T., CURRENT OPINION IN IMMUNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 412 - 8 | - CANMAN, C.E.; LIM, D.S., ONCOGENE, (1998), vol. 17, no. 25, pages 3301 - 3308 | - JACKSON, S.P., INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND CELL BIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 29, no. 7, pages 935 - 8 | - ZHONG, H. ET AL., CANCER RES, (2000), vol. 60, no. 6, pages 1541 - 1545 | - SCHAROVSKY, O.G.; ROZADOS, V.R.; GERVASONI, S.I; MATAR, P., JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 292 - 8 | - ASHBY, M.N., CURRENT OPINION IN LIPIDOLOGY, (1998), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 99 - 102 | - BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1989), vol. 1423, no. 3, pages 19 - 30 | - GREEN, M.C. ET AL., "Monoclonal Antibody Therapy for Solid Tumors", CANCER TREAT. REV., (2000), vol. 26, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1053/ctrv.2000.0176, pages 269 - 286, XP009019784 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/ctrv.2000.0176 | - "Tyrosine Kinase Signalling in Breast cancer:erbB Family Receptor Tyrosine Kinases", BREAST CANCER RES., (2000), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 176 - 183 | - BREKKEN, R.A. ET AL., "Selective Inhibition of VEGFR2 Activity by a monoclonal Anti-VEGF antibody blocks tumor growth in mice", CANCER RES., (2000), vol. 60, pages 5117 - 5124, XP002340113 | - ROSANIA ET AL., EXP. OPIN. THER. PATENTS, (2000), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 215 - 230 | - BALL ET AL., PROGRESS IN CELL CYCLE RES., (1997), vol. 3, page 125 | - RICHON ET AL., PROC. NAT ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2000), vol. 97, no. 18, pages 10014 - 10019 | - VIGUSHIN ET AL., ANTICANCER DRUGS, (200201), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 1 - 13 | - MARKS ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 25, pages 84 - 90 | - STENGER, COMMUNITY ONCOLOGY, (2007), vol. 4, pages 384 - 386 | - VINODHKUMAR ET AL., "Romidepsin, including pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof", BIOMEDICINE & PHARMACOTHERAPY, (2008), vol. 62, pages 85 - 93 | - "Panobinostat, including pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (2007), vol. 32, no. 4, pages 315 - 322 | - GOTTLICHER ET AL., "Valproic acid, including pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof", EM BO J., (2001), vol. 20, no. 24, pages 6969 - 6978 | - BALASUBRAMANIAN ET AL., "Mocetinostat (MGCD0103), including pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof", CANCER LETTERS, (2009), vol. 280, pages 211 - 221 | - BERTRAND, EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2010), vol. 45, pages 2095 - 2116 | - ADAMS J; KAUFFMAN M, "Bortezomib (Velcade@), including pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof", CANCER INVEST, (2004), vol. 22, no. 2, pages 304 - 11 | - BOUMA ET AL., "Disulfiram, including pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof", J. ANTIMICROB. CHEMOTHER., (1998), vol. 42, no. 6, pages 817 - 20 | - WILLIAMSON ET AL., "Epigallocatechin gallate (EGCG), including pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof", THE JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, (200612), vol. 118, no. 6, pages 1369 - 74 | - FELING, "Salinosporamide A, including pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof", ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (2003), vol. 42, no. 3, pages 355 - 7 | - KUHN DJ ET AL., "Carfilzomib, including pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof", BLOOD, (2007), vol. 110, pages 3281 - 3290 | - JIAW ET AL., "17-AAG(Geldanamycin), including pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof", BLOOD, (20030901), vol. 102, no. 5, pages 1824 - 32 | - LEE ET AL., "Radicicol, including pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof", MOL CELL ENDOCRINOL., (2002), vol. 188, pages 47 - 54 | - D. A. TENNANT, NATURE REVIEWS, (2010), page 267 | - P. LEDER, CANCER CELL, (2006), vol. 9, page 425 | - ALII ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2005), vol. 24, pages 39 - 46 | - CHOU; TALALAY, ADVANCES IN ENZYME REGULATION, (1984), vol. 22, pages 37 - 55 | - BERENBAUM, MC, ADV. CANCER RESEARCH, (1981), vol. 35, pages 269 - 335 |