EP3116634 - AN AERATED BIOFILM REACTOR WITH HOLLOW FIBRE MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/03] | AN AERATED BIOFILM REACTOR HOLLOW FIBRE MEMBRANE | ||
[2017/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University College Dublin National University Of Ireland, Dublin Belfield Dublin 4 / IE | [2017/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASEY, Eoin 8 Leinster Lawn Clonskeagh, Dublin 14 / IE | 02 /
SYRON, Eoin 9 Ballybawn Cottages Bray, County Wicklow / IE | [2018/23] |
Former [2017/03] | 01 /
CASEY, Eoin 5 Belfield Close Clonskeagh Dublin 14 / IE | ||
02 /
SYRON, Eoin Killacorraun Castlehill Balina, County Mayo / IE | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/23] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | ||
Former [2017/03] | O'Neill, Brian FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 15709177.8 | 11.03.2015 | [2017/03] | WO2015EP55047 | Priority number, date | GB20140004274 | 11.03.2014 Original published format: GB 201404274 | [2017/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015135977 | Date: | 17.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3116634 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3116634 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01D69/08, C02F3/12 | [2017/37] | CPC: |
B01D69/082 (EP,US);
B01D69/04 (CN,GB);
B01D69/08 (CN,GB);
C02F3/102 (US);
B01D53/228 (US);
B01D71/701 (EP,CN,GB,US);
B01J19/1893 (CN,GB);
C02F3/1268 (EP,US);
C02F3/208 (US);
C12M23/02 (EP,US);
C12M25/02 (EP,US);
C12M29/06 (EP,US);
Y02W10/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/03] | B01D69/08, B01D71/70, C02F3/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELÜFTETER BIOFILMREAKTOR MIT HOHLFASERMEMBRANEN | [2017/37] | English: | AN AERATED BIOFILM REACTOR WITH HOLLOW FIBRE MEMBRANES | [2017/37] | French: | MEMBRANE DE RÉACTEUR À FIBRES CREUSES AVEC BIOFILM AÉRÉ | [2017/03] |
Former [2017/03] | BELÜFTETER BIOFILMREAKTOR MIT HOHLFASERMEMBRAN | ||
Former [2017/03] | AN AERATED BIOFILM REACTOR HOLLOW FIBRE MEMBRANE | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 09.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2015 | AL | 06.06.2018 | AT | 06.06.2018 | CY | 06.06.2018 | CZ | 06.06.2018 | EE | 06.06.2018 | FI | 06.06.2018 | HR | 06.06.2018 | LT | 06.06.2018 | LV | 06.06.2018 | MC | 06.06.2018 | MK | 06.06.2018 | RO | 06.06.2018 | RS | 06.06.2018 | SI | 06.06.2018 | SK | 06.06.2018 | SM | 06.06.2018 | BG | 06.09.2018 | NO | 06.09.2018 | GR | 07.09.2018 | IS | 06.10.2018 | PT | 08.10.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 11.03.2015 | |
AL | 06.06.2018 | ||
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 06.06.2018 | |
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2033829 (AKZO NV); | [X]WO0001472 (UNIV PITTSBURGH [US]); | [X]JP2001201121 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [X]US2003140790 (HERCZEG ATTILA [US]); | [X]US2006096918 (SEMMENS MICHAEL J [US]); | [X]US2007131605 (WATARI KENJI [JP], et al); | [X]US2012125850 (FUJIMURA HIROKAZU [JP], et al) |