EP3195280 - MULTI-PLAYER, MULTI-TOUCH GAMING TABLE AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novomatic AG Wiener Strasse 158 2352 Gumpoldskirchen / AT | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUGLER, Andreas Wienerstrasse 158 A-2352 Gumpoldskirchen / AT | 02 /
LOYDOLD, Andreas Wienerstrasse 158 A-2352 Gumpoldskirchen / AT | [2017/30] | Application number, filing date | 15709462.4 | 09.03.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015EP54819 | Priority number, date | EP20140158687 | 10.03.2014 Original published format: EP 14158687 | [2017/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015135872 | Date: | 17.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3195280 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3195280 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/32 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
G07F17/322 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G07F17/32 (RU);
G07F17/3206 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A63F13/00 (RU);
G06F3/041 (EP,US);
G07F17/3209 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G07F17/3225 (EP,US);
G07F17/3227 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G07F17/3237 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G07F17/3248 (EP,US);
G07F17/3272 (EP,US);
G06F2203/0338 (EP,US);
G06F3/042 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Title | German: | SPIELTISCH FÜR MEHRERE SPIELER MIT MEHRFACHBERÜHRUNGSEINGABESPIELTISCH UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/21] | English: | MULTI-PLAYER, MULTI-TOUCH GAMING TABLE AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME | [2017/30] | French: | TABLE DE JEU MULTI-TACTILES, MULTI-JOUEURS ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION ASSOCIÉ | [2018/21] |
Former [2017/30] | SPIELTISCH FÜR MEHRERE SPIELER MIT MEHRFACHBERÜHRUNGSEINGABESPIELTISCH UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2017/30] | TABLE DE JEU MULTI-JOUEURS TACTILE MULTIPOINT ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/30] | 16.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2017/30] | 25.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 25.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 25.01.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 25.01.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.03.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 25.01.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 25.01.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.03.2017 | Decision despatched | 25.01.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 25.01.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.03.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 25.01.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 25.01.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.03.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.03.2015 | AL | 17.10.2018 | CY | 17.10.2018 | DK | 17.10.2018 | EE | 17.10.2018 | FI | 17.10.2018 | PL | 17.10.2018 | RO | 17.10.2018 | RS | 17.10.2018 | SE | 17.10.2018 | SK | 17.10.2018 | TR | 17.10.2018 | NO | 17.01.2019 | GR | 18.01.2019 | IS | 17.02.2019 | PT | 17.02.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | NO | 17.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6404904 (EINIGHAMMER HANS J [DE], et al); | [A]RU2185096 (OOO SON, et al); | [XI]EP1566729 (ARUZE CORP [JP]); | [XI]WO2007021249 (GRID IP PTE LTD [SG], et al); | [A]EP1895483 (ARISTOCRAT TECHNOLOGIES AU [AU]); | [A]US2009115133 (KELLY BRYAN M [US], et al); | [I]US2009143141 (WELLS WILLIAM R [US], et al); | [A]US2011263326 (GAGNER MARK B [US], et al); | [I]US2012329553 (GAGNER MARK B [US], et al); | [I]CN202795228U (BEIJING IE MEDIA ZHIYUAN TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]CN103092437 (UNIV TONGJI) | Examination | EP2568365 |